Eric Bratton v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: ERIC BRATTON
Defendant: EXPERAIN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05439
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 10/21/2019 at 11:00 AM. (iv)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc, Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Services LLC. (Neben, Katherine)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Katherine A Neben added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Neben, Katherine)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eric Bratton, upon Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Martin, George)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (lh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties (Martin, George)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ERIC BRATTON. (Martin, George)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 ERIC BRATTON. (Martin, George)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23963753 - Fee: $400. (Attorney George Thomas Martin, III added to party ERIC BRATTON(pty:pla))(Martin, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eric Bratton v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC BRATTON
Represented By: George Thomas Martin, III
Represented By: Nicholas J Bontrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERAIN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine A Neben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?