William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC v. Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC
Defendant: Writers Guild of America, East, Inc. and Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Meredith Stiehm
Case Number: 2:2019cv05465
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Ronald SW Lew
2 Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 29 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ethan E. Litwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimants Meredith Stiehm, Meredith Stiehm, Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24289089) filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Meredith Stiehm, Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Meredith Stiehm(pty:cc)) (Segall, Anthony)
August 19, 2019 Filing 28 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney W. Stephen Cannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimants Meredith Stiehm, Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24288718) filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Meredith Stiehm, Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Meredith Stiehm(pty:cc), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Anthony R Segall added to party Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Segall, Anthony)
August 19, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., Meredith Stiehm.(Attorney Stacey M Leyton added to party Meredith Stiehm(pty:cc))(Leyton, Stacey)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Upon Stipulation #25 , Defendants Writers Guild of America,West, Inc. and Writers Guild of America, East, Inc. shall have until September 13, 2019 to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. (et)
July 26, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 9/13/19 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pitts, P)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #23 , Defendants Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. and Writers Guild of America, East, Inc. shall have until 8/23/2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (gk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 8/23/19 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pitts, P)
July 10, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen P Berzon counsel for Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. Filed by Defendant Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen P Berzon added to party Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen P Berzon added to party Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.(pty:dft))(Berzon, Stephen)
July 10, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stacey M Leyton counsel for Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. Filed by Defendant Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attorney Stacey M Leyton added to party Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stacey M Leyton added to party Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.(pty:dft))(Leyton, Stacey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rebecca C Lee counsel for Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. Filed by Defendant Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attorney Rebecca C Lee added to party Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca C Lee added to party Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lee, Rebecca)
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney P Casey Pitts counsel for Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. Adding P. Casey Pitts as counsel of record for Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. and Writers Guild of America, East, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.. (Attorney P Casey Pitts added to party Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney P Casey Pitts added to party Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pitts, P)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Isabelle Mercier-Dalphond to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC, designating Diana Hughes Leiden as local counsel #8 . (gk)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Greenspan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC, designating Diana Hughes Leiden as local counsel #7 . (gk)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey L. Kessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC, designating Diana Hughes Leiden as local counsel #6 . (gk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC, upon Defendant Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tony Segal - Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Leiden, Diana)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC, upon Defendant Writers Guild of America, East, Inc. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Beau Willimon- President in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Leiden, Diana)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (vv)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05465 AB(AFMx). (rn)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. (car)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Isabelle Mercier-Dalphond to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23968362) filed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Leiden, Diana)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Greenspan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23968350) filed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Leiden, Diana)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey L. Kessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23968285) filed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Leiden, Diana)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC. (Leiden, Diana)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC identifying WME IMG, LLC d/b/a Endeavor as Corporate Parent. (Leiden, Diana)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC, identifying William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC, Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., WME IMG, LLC d/b/a Endeavor. (Leiden, Diana)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC. (Leiden, Diana)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23968035 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC(pty:pla))(Leiden, Diana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC v. Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Diana Hughes Leiden
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: Shawn R Obi
Represented By: David L Greenspan
Represented By: Isabelle Mercier-Dalphond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.
Represented By: Stacey M Leyton
Represented By: W Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Stephen P Berzon
Represented By: P Casey Pitts
Represented By: Rebecca C Lee
Represented By: Ethan E Litwin
Represented By: Anthony R Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.
Represented By: Stacey M Leyton
Represented By: W Stephen Cannon
Represented By: Stephen P Berzon
Represented By: P Casey Pitts
Represented By: Rebecca C Lee
Represented By: Ethan E Litwin
Represented By: Anthony R Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Meredith Stiehm
Represented By: Stacey M Leyton
Represented By: Anthony R Segall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?