Diana Solorio v. Sempris, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Diana Solorio
Defendant: Sempris, LLC, Doe Defendants 1-10 and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv05473
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Andre Birotte
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case transferred from Judge Otis D. Wright, II to the calendar of Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-05473 AB(PLAx). (rn)
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sempris, LLC answer now due 9/12/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Sempris, LLC.(Singer, David)
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sempris, LLC, identifying Big Bridge Holdings, Inc.; Beazley Insurance Company / Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London; Navigators Insurance Company; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.. (Singer, David)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David R Singer on behalf of Defendant Sempris, LLC (Attorney David R Singer added to party Sempris, LLC(pty:dft))(Singer, David)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINE SET FORTH IN LOCAL RULE 23-3 #13 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION for Relief from Local Rule 23-3 filed by Plaintiff Diana Solorio. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Kazerounian, Seyed)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Diana Solorio. upon Sempris, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew R. Devine. (Barthel, Nicholas)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-5473 ODW (PLAx). (mrgo)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jason A Ibey on behalf of Plaintiff Diana Solorio (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Jason A Ibey added to party Diana Solorio(pty:pla))(Ibey, Jason)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nicholas Barthel on behalf of Plaintiff Diana Solorio (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Nicholas Barthel added to party Diana Solorio(pty:pla))(Barthel, Nicholas)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05473 CAS(PLAx). (rn)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Sempris, LLC. (ghap)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Diana Solorio, identifying Sempris, LLC. (Kazerounian, Seyed)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Diana Solorio. (Kazerounian, Seyed)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Diana Solorio. (Kazerounian, Seyed)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23969253 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Diana Solorio. (Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Diana Solorio(pty:pla))(Kazerounian, Seyed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diana Solorio v. Sempris, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Solorio
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Sam H Nordean
Represented By: Joshua B Swigart
Represented By: Nicholas Barthel
Represented By: Jason A Ibey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sempris, LLC
Represented By: David R Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?