Colleen Witmer v. Steven A. Sugarman et al
Plaintiff: Colleen Witmer
Defendant: Ronald J. Nicolas, Jr., Douglas H. Bowers, Chad T. Brownstein, Steven A. Sugarman, Jeffrey T. Seabold, Banc of California, Inc., Eric L. Holoman, Jeffrey Karish, Halle J. Benett, Richard J. Lashley, Jonah F. Schnel and Robert D. Sznewajs
Interested Party: Donald Johnston
Case Number: 2:2019cv05488
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Andrew J Guilford
2 Judge: R Gary Klausner
3 Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James M Ficaro counsel for Plaintiff Colleen Witmer. Brett D. Stecker is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Collen Witmer. (Attorney James M Ficaro added to party Colleen Witmer(pty:pla))(Ficaro, James)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTING LEAD COUNSEL, AND RELATED MATTERS #19 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. The following related actions are hereby consolidated for all purposes, including pre-trial proceedings and trial (the "Consolidated Action"). Plaintiffs shall file, within sixty (60) days of entry of the Order approving this Stipulation, a consolidated complaint or designate a previously-filed complaint as the operative complaint (the "Consolidated Complaint"), which will supersede all existing complaints filed in the Related Actions and any other action that may be consolidated herewith. (See order for further details.) (es)
September 23, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTES OF STIPULATION CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTING LEAD COUNSEL, AND RELATED MATTERS held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court and counsel confer regarding matters as stated on the record. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court GRANTS the stipulations in all 3 cases and CONSOLIDATES these 3 matters. Further Orders to issue. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (es)
August 20, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Hearing on Stipulation Consolidating Related Actions, Appointing Lead Counsel, and Related Matters filed by Interested Party Donald Johnston. (Rifkin, Ashley)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER REGARDING STIPULATIONS by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court has received three identical stipulations in the above captioned cases. These stipulations ask the Court to consolidate related cases and appoint lead counsel, among other things. This matter should be set for a hearing, with notice sent to as many interested persons as reasonably possible. (es)
August 7, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 8:19-cv-00621-AG-DFMx, 8:19-cv-01152-AG-DFMx, 2:19-cv-05488-AG-DFMx filed by Interested Party Donald Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rifkin, Ashley)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Colleen Witmerto Order to Show Cause,, #16 (Germain, Daniel)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING STIPULATIONS TO CONSOLIDATE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: On July 23, 2019, counsel for Plaintiff and/or Interested Party, Donald Johnston filed a Stipulation to Consolidate in each of the above captioned cases. At that time, these cases were assigned to different district judges, making consolidation improper. In light of all three of the above captioned cases now being assigned to Judge Guilford, the stipulations are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE subject to refiling with the corrected information. The Court shall review the renewed stipulations if and when counsel choose to refile. (es)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than August 5, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiffs, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Answer to the Complaint; Request for Entry of Default; or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (F.R.Civ.P. 41). (es)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:17-cv-00118 AG(DFMx). Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to Judge Andrew J. Guilford for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05488 AG(DFMx). Signed by Judge Andrew J. Guilford (rn)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 8:19-cv-00621-CJC-DFM; 8:19-cv-01152-AG-DFM; 2:19-cv-05488-CJC-DFM filed by Interested Party Donald Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Ashley R Rifkin added to party Donald Johnston(pty:ip))(Rifkin, Ashley)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:17-cv-01678 CJC (DFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams and Judge R. Gary Klausner to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05488 CJC (DFMx). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney (esa)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Robert B Weiser. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Richard A Maniskas. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James M Ficaro. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brett D Stecker. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
June 24, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Banc of California, Inc., Halle J. Benett, Douglas H. Bowers, Chad T. Brownstein, Eric L. Holoman, Jeffrey Karish, Richard J. Lashley, Ronald J. Nicolas, Jr., Jonah F. Schnel, Jeffrey T. Seabold, Steven A. Sugarman, Robert D. Sznewajs. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Colleen Witmer. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/18/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Halle J. Benett, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Related Case(s) #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on June 24, 2019. (Darmer, Roman)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Halle J. Benett. Related Case(s): SACV 18-00246-CJC (DFMx) (Darmer, Roman)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Halle J. Benett, identifying CNA; Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance; Markel Insurance; Travelers; Starr Adjustment Services; Sompo Intn'l; XL; Allianze. (Darmer, Roman)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Halle J. Benett. (Darmer, Roman)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV21088 Receipt No: 0973-23972008 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Halle J. Benett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Roman E Darmer, II added to party Halle J. Benett(pty:dft))(Darmer, Roman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colleen Witmer v. Steven A. Sugarman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald J. Nicolas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas H. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad T. Brownstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. Sugarman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey T. Seabold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banc of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric L. Holoman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Karish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halle J. Benett
Represented By: Robert Moss Tiefenbrun
Represented By: Roman E Darmer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Lashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonah F. Schnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Sznewajs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Witmer
Represented By: Daniel L Germain
Represented By: James M Ficaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Donald Johnston
Represented By: Ashley R Rifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?