David Louis Whitehead v. Netflix Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Louis Whitehead
Defendant: MGM INC, JP Morgan, UNNAMED DEWAYNE WICKHAM, AMAZON BOOKS, Comcast, CBS Inc, MARVEL STUDIOS LLC ( MARVEL ), BUENA VISTA HOME ENTERTAINMENT, Cirque du Soleil, Verizon Communication Inc., AMAZON STUDIO, UNNAMED TOM CRUISE AND PAULA WAGNER, Viacom, MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT, Paramount Pictures Inc, UNNAMED RANDOM HOUSE PUBLISHER, SONY HOME ENTERTAINMENT INC, UNNAMED TYLER PERRY, Walt Disney Company, LIONSGATE HOME ENTERTAINMENT, JOHN DOES 1-15, ET AL, Netflix Inc, Bank of America, John Does 1-10 and UNNAMED COLONY CAPITAL
Case Number: 2:2019cv05500
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
3 Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 APPEAL FEE PAID: re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #147 as to Plaintiff David Louis Whitehead; Receipt Number: LA193902 in the amount of $505. (mdm)
August 16, 2019 Filing 151 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge John F. Walter. On July 19, 2019 #144 , the Court ordered this action dismissed with prejudice. Attached are documents received, reviewed, and not accepted for filing by the Court. (iv)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #147 filed by David Louis Whitehead. CCA # 19-55905. A review of this court's docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for this appeal remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. If appellant fails to comply with this order, this appeal may be dismissed by the (9th CCA) Clerk for failure to prosecute. (mat)
August 5, 2019 Filing 149 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 19-55905 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #147 as to Plaintiff David Louis Whitehead. (mat)
August 2, 2019 Filing 148 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to plaintiff David Louis Whitehead, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #147 . (mat)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge John F. Walter. On July 19, 2019 #144 , the Court ordered this action dismissed with prejudice. Attached are documents received, reviewed, and not accepted for filing by the Court. (lom)
July 29, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff David Louis Whitehead. Appeal of Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Terminated Case #144 Filed On: 7/19/19; Entered On: 7/19/19; Filing fee $ 505 BILLED. (mat)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter. On July 19, 2019 #144 , the Court ordered this action dismissed with prejudice. Attached are all documents received, reviewed, and not accepted for filing by the Court to date by plaintiff, David Louis Whitehead. No further filings will be accepted or docketed in this case. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4) (lom)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS: ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge John F. Walter. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to the Vexatious Litigant Prefiling Order. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting #142 Non-Resident Attorney Mariah L. Hornok APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Netflix Inc, Viacom, designating Emily F Evitt as local counsel. (lom)
July 18, 2019 Filing 142 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mariah L. Hornok to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Netflix Inc, Viacom (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24109659) filed by Defendants Netflix Inc, Viacom. (Attachments: #1 Arizona Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Utah Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proof of Service on Pro Se Plaintiff) (Evitt, Emily)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting #136 Non-Resident Attorney Cole A. Riddell APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Netflix, Inc. and Viacom, Inc., designating Emily F. Evitt as local counsel. (sbou)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting #135 Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer H. Doan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Netflix, Inc. and Viacom, Inc., designating Emily F. Evitt as local counsel. (sbou)
July 12, 2019 Filing 139 DECLARATION of Jennifer H. Doan Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendants Netflix Inc, Viacom. (Evitt, Emily)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05500 JFW(RAOx). (rn)
July 8, 2019 Filing 137 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendants Netflix Inc, Viacom, re Status Report #134 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cole A. Riddell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Netflix Inc, Viacom (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24033852) #136 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer H. Doan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Netflix Inc, Viacom (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24033847) #135 served on 07/05/2019. (Evitt, Emily)
July 3, 2019 Filing 136 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cole A. Riddell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Netflix Inc, Viacom (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24033852) filed by Defendants Netflix Inc, Viacom. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Evitt, Emily)
July 3, 2019 Filing 135 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer H. Doan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Netflix Inc, Viacom (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24033847) filed by Defendants Netflix Inc, Viacom. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Evitt, Emily)
July 3, 2019 Filing 134 STATUS REPORT FOLLOWING TRANSFER FILED PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPH 11 OF THIS COURT'S STANDING ORDER filed by Defendants Netflix Inc, Viacom. (Evitt, Emily)
July 2, 2019 Filing 133 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Netflix Inc, Viacom, re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #131 , Response, #132 served on 07/02/2019. (Evitt, Emily)
July 2, 2019 Filing 132 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Netflix Inc, Viacomto Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,, #126 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,, #124 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,, #125 (Evitt, Emily)
July 2, 2019 Filing 131 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily F Evitt counsel for Defendants Netflix Inc, Viacom. Adding Emily F. Evitt as counsel of record for Defendants Netflix, Inc. and Viacom, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Certain Defendants Netflix, Inc. and Viacom, Inc.. (Attorney Emily F Evitt added to party Netflix Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Emily F Evitt added to party Viacom(pty:dft))(Evitt, Emily)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner to the calendar of Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-05500 JFW(Ex). (rn)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-05500 RGK(Ex). (rn)
June 25, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mariah Leigh Hornok. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 125 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Cole Alan Riddell. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer Haltom Doan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (lh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 120 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Texas Eastern
June 24, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 2:18-cv-00460-RWS-RSP, from U.S. District Court Eastern District of Texas (Marshall). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:19-cv-05500-CAS (Ex). (lh)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #70 Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/24/2019. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 118 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #113 MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ATTACH ADDED EXHIBITS TO HIS AMENDED COMPLAINTS: FIRST, SECOND OR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT WITH EXHIBITS, ALLOWED BY THE COURT, IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 41, #2 Exhibit 42, #3 Exhibit 48, #4 Exhibit 49, #5 Exhibit 49 B, #6 Exhibit 51, #7 Exhibit 53, #8 Exhibit 54)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 117 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #113 MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ATTACH ADDED EXHIBITS TO HIS AMENDED COMPLAINTS: FIRST, SECOND OR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT WITH EXHIBITS, ALLOWED BY THE COURT, IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 25, #2 Exhibit 26, #3 Exhibit 28, #4 Exhibit 29, #5 Exhibit 30, #6 Exhibit 31, #7 Exhibit 31 (1), #8 Exhibit 32, #9 Exhibit 33-35, #10 Exhibit 36, #11 Exhibit 37, #12 Exhibit 38)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 116 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #113 MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ATTACH ADDED EXHIBITS TO HIS AMENDED COMPLAINTS: FIRST, SECOND OR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT WITH EXHIBITS, ALLOWED BY THE COURT, IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13, #2 Exhibit 14, #3 Exhibit 15, #4 Exhibit 16, #5 Exhibit 17, #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 18B, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20, #10 Exhibit 20B, #11 Exhibit 21, #12 Exhibit 21A, #13 Exhibit 22, #14 Exhibit 23)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 115 Additional Attachments to Main Document(EXHBIT 11C PART 2): #113 MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ATTACH ADDED EXHIBITS TO HIS AMENDED COMPLAINTS: FIRST, SECOND OR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT WITH EXHIBITS, ALLOWED BY THE COURT, IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 114 Additional Attachments to Main Document (EXHIBIT 11C PART 1): #113 MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ATTACH ADDED EXHIBITS TO HIS AMENDED COMPLAINTS: FIRST, SECOND OR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT WITH EXHIBITS, ALLOWED BY THE COURT, IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 113 MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ATTACH ADDED EXHIBITS TO HIS AMENDED COMPLAINTS: FIRST, SECOND OR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT WITH EXHIBITS, ALLOWED BY THE COURT, IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS by David Louis Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 AFFIDAVIT OF DAVID LOUIS WHITEHEAD, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 1A, #5 Exhibit 1B, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 2B, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 11B)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 112 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE PLEADING (CONSENT TO TRANSFER CASE TO CALIFORNIA) by David Louis Whitehead (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 111 PLAINTIFF S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RECUSAL OF JUDGE ROBERT SCHROEDER III AND MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROY PAYNE DUE TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURES 28 U.S.C. SECTION 455 A, Bl, B2, B3, B4, AS AMENDED by David Louis Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 21, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #71 MOTION for Leave to File, #83 MOTION, #63 MOTION, #67 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING BRIEF, #98 MOTION for Hearing re #70 MOTION to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) , #67 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING BRIEF , #108 MOTION for Default Judgment as to, #60 MOTION TO COURT TO WAIVE PLAINTIFF FOLLOWING THE COURT'S LOCAL RULES, #81 MOTION, #109 MOTION, #87 MOTION to Strike, #64 MOTION to Change Venue, #100 MOTION to Vacate, #70 MOTION to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) : Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 110 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO HIS MOTION TO AMEND HIS SECOND COMPLAINT AND A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AMENDMENT WITH EXHIBITS filed by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 109 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ALLOW HIS FILED A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AS HISSECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, FILED TIMELY by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 108 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 55a. by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 107 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE LEADING by David Louis Whitehead (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 106 PLAINTIFF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S AMENDED DECLARATIONS filed by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 105 RESPONSE to Motion re #83 MOTION, #87 MOTION to Strike, #88 MOTION for Sanctions, #81 MOTION filed by Netflix Inc., VIACOM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of T. Foster, #2 Exhibit B - Letter, #3 Text of Proposed Order re Dkt. 081, #4 Text of Proposed Order re Dkt. 083, #5 Text of Proposed Order re Dkt. 087, #6 Text of Proposed Order re Dkt. 088)(Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 104 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #103 PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS.. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 103 PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by David Louis Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE by Netflix Inc. re #70 MOTION to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) Notice of Amended Declaration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 101 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS ORTRANSER ON JUNE 24, 2019 at 2PM. filed by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 100 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE ORDER AND TRANSFER TO LOUISIANA by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 99 RESPONSE in Opposition re #71 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Netflix Inc., VIACOM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION for Hearing re #70 MOTION to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) , #67 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING BRIEF by Netflix Inc., VIACOM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 97 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #93 Response to Motion,,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 65C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 65D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 65F, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 65G, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 65 Hand I, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 65J, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 65E, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 66, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 67, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 67B, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 68, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 69, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 69A)(klc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 96 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #93 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS, WITH A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, WITH EXHIBITS (A FULLER PRESENTATION THEN SHORT AND PLAIN STATEMENT DUE TO YEARS INVOLVED IN CONTROVERSY AND 9-B FRAUD RICO CONSPIRA CY ALLEGATIONS) RULE 15 A, and 15 A (2) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31, #2 Exhibit 32, #3 Exhibit 33, #4 Exhibit TXU 464-537, #5 Exhibit TXU464-537, #6 Exhibit TXU-839-681, #7 Exhibit TXU-1-057-841, #8 Exhibit TX 4-731-555, #9 Exhibit TXU1-251-871, #10 Exhibit PAU-2-315-942, #11 Exhibit TX 4-808-444, #12 Exhibit PAU 1-935-233, #13 Exhibit TXU 448 140, #14 Exhibit PAU-2*392-263, #15 Exhibit TXU-743-018, #16 Exhibit PAU 3-005-957, #17 Exhibit 64 A&B, #18 Exhibit 65 A)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 95 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #93 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS, WITH A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, WITH EXHIBITS (A FULLER PRESENTATION THEN SHORT AND PLAIN STATEMENT DUE TO YEARS INVOLVED IN CONTROVERSY AND 9-B FRAUD RICO CONSPIRA CY ALLEGATIONS) RULE 15 A, and 15 A (2) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22A, #2 Exhibit 22B, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24, #5 Exhibit 24A, #6 Exhibit 24B, #7 Exhibit 25, #8 Exhibit 25B, #9 Exhibit 26, #10 Exhibit 27, #11 Exhibit 28, #12 Exhibit 28B, #13 Exhibit 28C&D, #14 Exhibit 28E, #15 Exhibit 28F, #16 Exhibit 29)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 94 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #93 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS, WITH A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, WITH EXHIBITS (A FULLER PRESENTATION THEN SHORT AND PLAIN STATEMENT DUE TO YEARS INVOLVED IN CONTROVERSY AND 9-B FRAUD RICO CONSPIRA CY ALLEGATIONS) RULE 15 A, and 15 A (2) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit 12, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit 16, #7 Exhibit 16A, #8 Exhibit 17, #9 Exhibit 17A, #10 Exhibit 18, #11 Exhibit 18A, #12 Exhibit 18B, #13 Exhibit 18C, #14 Exhibit 18D, #15 Exhibit 18E, #16 Exhibit 18F, #17 Exhibit 18G, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 21A)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 93 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS, WITH A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, WITH EXHIBITS (A FULLER PRESENTATION THEN SHORT AND PLAIN STATEMENT DUE TO YEARS INVOLVED IN CONTROVERSY AND 9-B FRAUD RICO CONSPIRACY ALLEGATIONS) RULE 15 A, and 15 A (2) filed by David Louis Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 2A, #5 Exhibit 2B, #6 Exhibit 2C, #7 Exhibit 2C1, #8 Exhibit 2D, #9 Exhibit 2D1, #10 Exhibit 2E, #11 Exhibit 2F, #12 Exhibit 3, #13 Exhibit VC1, #14 Exhibit VC2, #15 Exhibit 5, #16 Exhibit 5A, #17 Exhibit 6, #18 Exhibit 7, #19 Exhibit 8)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 92 REPLY to Response to Motion re #70 MOTION to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Netflix Inc., VIACOM. (Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mariah Leigh Hornok on behalf of Netflix Inc., VIACOM (Hornok, Mariah) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 90 REPLY to Response to Motion re #67 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING BRIEF filed by Netflix Inc., VIACOM. (Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 89 OPPOSITION TO TRANSFER CASE TO CALIFORNIA, BUT TO NEW YORK, WHERE WITNESSES ARELOCATED AND A PLACE WHERE DEFENDANTS HAVE BUSINESSES filed by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 88 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS TO BE APPLIED AGAINST DEFENDANTS RELATED TO OPPOSING COUNSEL RETURNING PROPERLY FILED AND SERVED PLEADINGS TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF, and HOLDING ORIGINAL 1992 FBI LETTER, AS A STRATEGY TO DISMISS THE CASE AND DENIED LEAVE TO AMEND SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND OTHER FORMS OF RELIEF by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S ORDERS AND MOTION TO TRANSFER AND DISMISS PLEADINGS, IN THE ALTERNATIVE TRANSFER TO NEW YORK by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 86 PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PLEADINGS RELATED TO HIS MOTIONFOR LEAVE TO AMEND HIS SECOND COMPLAINT by David Louis Whitehead (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 85 RESPONSE to Motion re #64 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Netflix Inc., VIACOM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 84 RESPONSE to Motion re #60 MOTION TO COURT TO WAIVE PLAINTIFF FOLLOWING THE COURT'S LOCAL RULES filed by Netflix Inc., VIACOM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 83 PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED MOTION TO UNSEAL FEDERAL INVESTIGATION AND TRANSFER TO NEW YORK. by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 82 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE, WITH HIS SEPARATE CONSOLIDATED MOTION TO UNSEAL FEDERAL INVESTIGATION AND STAY TRANSFER PENDING THE COURT'S RULING. filed by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 81 EMERGENCY MOTION TO CORRECT UNNUMBERED CAPTIONED PAGE 1 OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND HIS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, DUE TO ERROR by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 80 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RELATING TO PRO SE FILINGS ON JUNE 4, 2019, AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REQUEST LEAVE TO MAKE CORRECTIONS by David Louis Whitehead (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 79 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #75 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING BRIEF,REQUESTING DISCOVERY AND THE COURT TO UNSEAL THE FEDERAL INVESTIGATION ANDOTHER DISCOVERY MATTERS TO DEMONSTRATE COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, FRAUD ANDOTHER ALLEGED CLAIMS FOR RELIEF (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Continuance of 4, #2 Exhibit 5)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 78 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #75 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING BRIEF,REQUESTING DISCOVERY AND THE COURT TO UNSEAL THE FEDERAL INVESTIGATION ANDOTHER DISCOVERY MATTERS TO DEMONSTRATE COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, FRAUD ANDOTHER ALLEGED CLAIMS FOR RELIEF (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 77 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #75 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING BRIEF,REQUESTING DISCOVERY AND THE COURT TO UNSEAL THE FEDERAL INVESTIGATION ANDOTHER DISCOVERY MATTERS TO DEMONSTRATE COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, FRAUD ANDOTHER ALLEGED CLAIMS FOR RELIEF filed by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 76 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #75 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING BRIEF,REQUESTING DISCOVERY AND THE COURT TO UNSEAL THE FEDERAL INVESTIGATION ANDOTHER DISCOVERY MATTERS TO DEMONSTRATE COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, FRAUD ANDOTHER ALLEGED CLAIMS FOR RELIEF filed by David Louis Whitehead. (Attachments: # 1 PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING BRIEF, REQUESTING DISCOVERY AND THE COURT TO UNSEAL THE FEDERAL INVESTIGATION AND OTHER DISCOVERY MATTERS TO DEMONSTRATE COPYRIGHTINFRINGEMENT, FRAUD AND OTHER ALLEGED CLAIMS FOR RELIEF.. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 75 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING BRIEF,REQUESTING DISCOVERY AND THE COURT TO UNSEAL THE FEDERAL INVESTIGATION ANDOTHER DISCOVERY MATTERS TO DEMONSTRATE COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, FRAUD ANDOTHER ALLEGED CLAIMS FOR RELIEF filed by David Louis Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING BRIEF, REQUESTING DISCOVERY AND THE COURT TO UNSEAL THE FEDERAL INVESTIGATION AND OTHER DISCOVERY MATTERS TO DEMONSTRATE COPYRIGHTINFRINGEMENT, FRAUD AND OTHER ALLEGED CLAIMS FOR RELIEF, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 74 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS NETFLIX, INC. AND VIACOM, INC.'S SURREPLY TOPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO AMEND HIS SECOND [SIC] AMENDEDCOMPLAINT AFTER DEFENDANTS VIACOM AND NETFLIX RESPONDS [SIC] BY MAY 28, 2019 filed by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 73 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S THE WALT DISNEY COMPANY AND MARVELENTERTAINMENT, LLC'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO THE WALT DISNEY COMPANYAND MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT, LLC'S SURREPLY OPPOSING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FORSANCTIONS AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT, REQUESTING THE COURT TO DENIED DEFENDANT'SMOTION TO DISMISS AS A SANCTION AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT filed by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 72 PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, FRAUD, RICO 9-BFRAUD, SECURITIES FRAUD, ANTI-TRUST, CIVIL RIGHTS VIOLATIONS (5th and 14th Amendments), Breach of Contract, Conspiracy, TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE WITH POTENTIAL CONTRACT,VIOLATIONS OF THE LANHAM ACT 15 U.S.C. 5 1124-1125). CONSPIRACY TO STEALINTELLECTUAL PROPERTIES, UNFAIR DEALINGS, VIOLATIONS OF PRIVACY, FALSEADVERTISEMENT, AUTHORIZED SALES OF COPYRIGHTED MATERIAL, Fraudulent, Unfair,and Deceptive Business Practices, Negligence, BAD FAITH DEALINGS, IMPROPERDISSEMINATION OF INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY AND MISAPPROPRIATION OFCOPYRIGHTED MATERIAL, VIOLATIONS OF SHERMAN ACT AS AMENDED (15 U.S.C.Section 4 and 28 U.S.C. Section 2201 (a). against Netflix Inc., VIACOM, WALT DISNEY COMPANY, MARVEL STUDIOS LLC ( MARVEL ), BUENA VISTA HOME ENTERTAINMENT, PARAMOUNT PICTURES INC, SONY HOME ENTERTAINMENT INC, MGM INC, LIONSGATE HOME ENTERTAINMENT, Comcast, CBS Inc, JP Morgan, BANK OF AMERICA, VERIZON COMMUNICATION INC., Cirque du Soleil, AMAZON STUDIO, AMAZON BOOKS, UNNAMED RANDOM HOUSE PUBLISHER, UNNAMED COLONY CAPITAL, UNNAMED DEWAYNE WICKHAM, UNNAMED TYLER PERRY, UNNAMED TOM CRUISE AND PAULA WAGNER, JOHN DOES 1-15, ET AL, filed by David Louis Whitehead.(nkl, )[Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 71 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE HIS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, UNOPPOSED BY DEFENDANTS, IN PART, WITH DEFENDANTS REQUESTING PLAINTIFF TO AMEND HIS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES, AND PLAINTIFF REQUESTED DEFENDANTS TO AGREE TO ALLOW HIM TO AMEND HIS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF PROCEDURE 15 (A) (2) by David Louis Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 AFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND SECOND COMPLAINT)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Netflix Inc., VIACOM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 69 RESPONSE to #62 Response to Non-Motion THE WALT DISNEY COMPANY AND MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT, LLC'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO THE WALT DISNEY COMPANY AND MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT, LLC'S SURREPLY OPPOSING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT filed by MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT, WALT DISNEY COMPANY. (Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 68 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #49 MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO AMEND HIS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AFTER DEFENDANTS VIACOM AND NETFLIX RESPONDS BY MAY 28, 2019 filed by Netflix Inc., VIACOM. (Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING BRIEF by Netflix Inc., VIACOM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 66 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to a copy of docket sheet by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 65 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE/REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO HIS REQUEST TO ALLOW HIMTO AMEND SECOND COMPLAINT TEN (10) DAYS, AFTER DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO FIRSTAMENDED COMPLAINT filed by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 64 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE TO LOUISIANA, CALIFORNIA OR NEW YORK by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 63 PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE ORDER FORMS, AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FORRECUSAL OF JUDGE THOMAS PAINE RELATING TO HIS EMERGENCY MOTION FILED MARCH 21,2019. by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 62 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE/REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO HIS REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST WALT DISNEY COMPANY AND MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT filed by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 61 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE/REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S Surreply (Defendants OPPOSING COMPELLING TO DISCOVERY), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE REQUEST LEAVE TO FILE filed by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION TO COURT TO WAIVE PLAINTIFF FOLLOWING THE COURT'S LOCAL RULES AS A PRO SE LITIGANT DUE TO ALLEGATIONS OF MISCONDUCT & MISREPRESENTATION ASSOCIATED WITH THE CLERK'S OFFICE by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 59 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #47 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Netflix Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 22, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #49 MOTION, #38 MOTION, #18 MOTION, #43 MOTION, #24 MOTION, #51 MOTION for Sanctions, #54 MOTION for Default Judgment as to, #44 MOTION, #28 MOTION, #9 MOTION, #13 MOTION for Recusal, #7 MOTION, #50 MOTION, #47 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing RESET for 6/24/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 22, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #49 MOTION, #38 MOTION, #18 MOTION, #43 MOTION, #24 MOTION, #51 MOTION for Sanctions, #54 MOTION for Default Judgment as to, #44 MOTION, #28 MOTION, #9 MOTION, #13 MOTION for Recusal, #7 MOTION, #50 MOTION, #47 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 58 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION, #51 MOTION for Sanctions, #44 MOTION Plaintiff's Motions for Default Judgment and Sanctions filed by MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT, WALT DISNEY COMPANY. (Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 57 RESPONSE to Motion re #49 MOTION to Allow Plaintiff to Amend His Second [SIC] Amended Complaint After Defendants Viacom and Netflix Responds [SIC] by May 28, 2019 filed by Netflix Inc., VIACOM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #47 MOTION to Compel filed by David Louis Whitehead. (klc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 55 RESPONSE to Motion re #47 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Netflix Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 54 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE/REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION FOR SANCTIONS AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT, REQUESTING JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS DUE TO FRAUD ON THE COURT by David Louis Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF SUPPORTING HIS REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, AND JUDGMENT, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE PLEADING- Trip Cancelled by David Louis Whitehead (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 52 RESPONSE to Motion re #50 MOTION, #51 MOTION for Sanctions, #44 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT, WALT DISNEY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 51 PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR SANCTIONS TO BE APPLIED AGAINST WALT DISNEY COMPANY AND MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT DUE OPPOSING COUNSEL JENNIFER DOAN, REPRESENTING THE COMPANIES WITHOUT ENTERING AN APPEARANCE by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 50 EXPEDITED MOTION FOR RULING ON DEFAULT JUDGMENT, UNOPPOSED BY COUNSEL, WHO DO NOT REPRESENT WALT DISNEY AND MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT, BUT HAS PROVIDED SHADOW-GHOST LEGAL REPRESENTATION FOR THESE DEFENDANTS. See Separate Motion for Sanctions. by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO AMEND HIS SECOND COMPLAINT AFTER DEFENDANTS VIACOM AND NETFLIX RESPONDS BY MAY 28, 2019, NOTING THAT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO AMEND HIS SECOND COMPLAINT WAS UNOPPOSED BY COUNSELS FOR NETFLIX AND VIACOM by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 48 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE/REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S EXTENSION OF TIME BASED ON AGREEMENT BY PARTIES, REQUESTING DEFAULT JUDGEMENT TO BE ENTERED AGAINST WALT DISNEY COMPANY AND MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT filed by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 47 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (INTERROGATORIES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS REQUESTS) ASSOCIATED TO HIS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO UNSEAL THE FEDERAL INVESTIGATION by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Netflix Inc. to 5/28/2019. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/28/2019. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint,, by Netflix Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 44 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT AGAINST WALT DISNEY AND MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT, PROPERLY SERVED THE COMPLAINT AND AMENDED COMPLAINT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE ALLOW RE-SERVICE OF COMPLAINT AND AMENDED COMPLAINT VIA CSC. by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 43 AMENDED MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, REQUESTING THE COURT TO ISSUE A WARNING TO ABC PROCESS SERVICE IN DALLAS, TEXAS. by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE PLEADING ON SERVICE OF COMPLAINT ON NETFLIX INC by David Louis Whitehead (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for VIACOM to 5/28/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 41 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re VIACOM.( Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cole Alan Riddell on behalf of VIACOM (Riddell, Cole) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of VIACOM (Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 38 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF REGARDING PROCESS SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NETFLIX INC, by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE PLEADING ON SERVICE ON THE DEFENDANTS: NETFLIX INC, by David Louis Whitehead (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 36 AMENDED NOTICE PLEADING ON SERVICE ON THE DEFENDANTS: WALT DISNEY, and MARVELENTERTAINMENT BY PARCELS INC of Wilmington, Delaware. by David Louis Whitehead (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 35 AMENDED NOTICE PLEADING ON SERVICE ON THE DEFENDANTS: WALT DISNEY, and VIACOM INC, BY WYATT PROCESS Inc. by David Louis Whitehead (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE PLEADING ON SERVICE ON THE DEFENDANTS: NETFLIX INC, WALT DISNEY, VIACOM, MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT by David Louis Whitehead (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 33 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO NETFLIX RESPONSE TO HIS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF ON NEVERLAND PROPERTY SALE, MISSION JMPOSSIBLE, PASSION OF THE CHRIST, FORREST GUMP, THIS IS IT, HOW STELLA GOT HER GROOVE BACK, RESPECT and OTHERS TO BE DETERMINED filed by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 32 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO NETFLIX DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO HIS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF RELATING TO THE COURT UNSEALING THE FEDERAL INVESTIGATION (DOJ-FBI) INVOLVING ALLEGATIONS OF FRAUD ON THE COURT AND MASSIVE COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT AND THIEF OF THE PLAINTIFFS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTIES AND COPYRIGHTS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE UNSEAL INVESTIGATION (IN CAMERA) SUPPORTING JUDICIAL GUIDANCE OF THIS LITIGATION filed by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by Netflix Inc. re #18 MOTION, #25 Response to Non-Motion, Notice regarding Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief (Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Issued as to MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT, WALT DISNEY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Walt Disney Company)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 29 PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION FOR RECUSAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROY PAINE #26 Response to Motion filed by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 28 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF ON MISSION:IMPOSSIBLE, PASSION OF THE CHRIST, FORREST GUMP, THIS IS IT", "HOW STELLA GOT HER GROOVE BACK, "RESPECT" and OTHERS TO BE DETERMINED by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 27 PLAINTIFF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION FOR RECUSAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROY PAINE #26 Response to Motion filed by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION for Recusal filed by Netflix Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 25 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S NON-POSITION ON UNSEALING THE FEDERAL INVESTIGATION, STAYING THE SALE OF NEVERLAND, ALLOWING THE PUBLIC CORRUPTION MAP TO BE FILED IN THE COURT'S RECORDS filed by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 24 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RECUSAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROY PAINE DUE TO CONFLICTS OF INTEREST AND/OR THE APPEARANCE OF CONFLICTS OF INTEREST PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURES 28 U.S.C. SECTION 455 a, bl, b2, b3, b4, AND PLAINTIFF REQUESTS ASSIGNMENT OF SPECIAL JUDGE HAVING NO CONFLICTS OF INTEREST TO PRESIDE OVER THIS ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Netflix Inc. to 4/29/2019. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/16/2019. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 22 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint,, by Netflix Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cole Alan Riddell on behalf of Netflix Inc. (Riddell, Cole) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Netflix Inc. (Doan, Jennifer) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Issued as to VIACOM, WALT DISNEY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Walt Disney Company)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 18 PLAINTIFF S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (STAYING THE SALE OF NEVERLAND PROPERTY OWNED BY COLONY CAPITAL) TIED TO THE DISPUTE, AND RELATED TO THE FEDERAL INVESTIGATION IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE AND RELATED CASES. by David Louis Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 AFFIDAVIT OF DAVID LOUIS WHITEHEAD REQUESTING THE COURT TO ISSUE AN INJUNCTIVE ORDER STAYING THE SALE OF THE PROPERTY NEVERLAND ASSOCIATED WITH COLONY CAPITAL AND THE LATE MICHAEL JACKSON)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Rodney Gilstrap recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/4/2019. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 MOTION FOR ADDED TIME TO SERVE VIACOM, WALT DISNEY AND MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT DEFENDANT ; granting #14 PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO CORRECT AMENDED COMPLAINT PAGE Number 12, at Date, due to Error ; granting #15 PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO CORRECT AMENDED COMPLAINT PAGE Number 6, at Paragraph number 15, due to Error. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/3/2019. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO CORRECT AMENDED COMPLAINT PAGE Number 6, at Paragraph number 15, due to Error by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO CORRECT AMENDED COMPLAINT PAGE Number 12, at Date, due to Error by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 PLAINTIFF S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RECUSAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROY S. PAYNE DUE TO BIAS OR APPEARANCE OF BIAS PREVIOUSLY EMPLOYED IN WESTERN DISTRICT OF LOUISIANA, WHERE MASSIVE FRAUD OCCURRED. 28 U.S.C. SECTION 455 a, bl, b2, b3, b4. by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued as to MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT, Netflix Inc., VIACOM, WALT DISNEY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION FOR ADDED TIME TO SERVE VIACOM, WALT DISNEY AND MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT DEFENDANT by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 PLAINTIFF S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, FRAUD, ANTITRUST, CIVIL RIGHTS VIOLATIONS (5th and 14th Amendments), Breach of Contract, TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE WITH POTENTIAL CONTRACT, VIOLATIONS OF THE LANHAM ACT, CONSPIRACYTO STEAL INTELLECTUAL PROPERTIES, UNFAIR DEALINGS, VIOLATIONS OF PRIVACY, FALSE advertisement, Fraudulent, Unfair, and Deceptive Business Practices, Negligence,BAD FAITH DEALINGS against John Does 1-10, Netflix Inc., MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT, WALT DISNEY COMPANY, VIACOM, filed by David Louis Whitehead.(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Store and Record Exhibit 107 (Public Corruption Map) by Attorney Beth Ann Walker, Supporting Motion to Stay and Unseal Federal Investigation by David Louis Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Netflix Inc.. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Stay and Unseal the Federal Investigation Relating to Massive Theft of Plaintiff's Copyright And Other Fraud and Conflicts, and to Correct the Plaintiff's Name in the Captioned of the Above Captioned Case, or in the Alternative, Grant An Extension of Time to Service Defendants, Pending the Court's Order to Correct the Captioned of this Case by David Louis Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE To Correct Caption of Case filed by David Louis Whitehead (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(klc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT COURT FOR LOUISIANA SHREVEPORT, WHERE THE FRAUD ON THE COURT OCCURRED IN PLAINTIFF'S CASES, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE GRANT AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE GRANT LEAVE FOR AN ADDED TIME TO OBTAIN THE LEGAL ASSISTANCE OF COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/30/2019. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 EMERGENCY MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT COURT FOR LOUISIANA SHREVEPORT, WHERE THE FRAUD ON THE COURT OCCURRED IN PLAINTIFF'S CASES, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE GRANT AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE GRANT LEAVE FOR AN ADDED TIME TO OBTAIN THE LEGAL ASSISTANCE OF COUNSEL by David Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Louis Whitehead, #2 Exhibit)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of David Louis Whitehead by David Whitehead. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/5/2018. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing fee: received $ 400.00, receipt number 6-44429. (mjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-10, Netflix Inc., filed by David Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 6/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Louis Whitehead v. Netflix Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNNAMED DEWAYNE WICKHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON BOOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARVEL STUDIOS LLC ( MARVEL )
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUENA VISTA HOME ENTERTAINMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cirque du Soleil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communication Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON STUDIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNNAMED TOM CRUISE AND PAULA WAGNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: Mariah Leigh Hornok
Represented By: Cole Alan Riddell
Represented By: Emily F Evitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Pictures Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNNAMED RANDOM HOUSE PUBLISHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONY HOME ENTERTAINMENT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNNAMED TYLER PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Disney Company
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIONSGATE HOME ENTERTAINMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-15, ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: Mariah Leigh Hornok
Represented By: Cole Alan Riddell
Represented By: Emily F Evitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNNAMED COLONY CAPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Louis Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?