Michelle Rios v. Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Rios
Defendant: Leigh Cornell, Anitha Reddi, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv05505
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendants Leigh Cornell, Does, Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center, Anitha Reddi. (bm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michelle Rios. (Lesches, Levi)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #8 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Please fill case no. with Judge's initials. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Michelle Rios (Lesches, Levi)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michelle Rios. (Lesches, Levi)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michelle Rios. (Lesches, Levi)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michelle Rios. (Lesches, Levi)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23976163 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Michelle Rios. (Attorney Levi Lesches added to party Michelle Rios(pty:pla))(Lesches, Levi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michelle Rios v. Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Rios
Represented By: Levi Lesches
Represented By: I Benjamin Blady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigh Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anitha Reddi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pomona Valley Hospital Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?