Mitchell McPherson v. First American Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Mitchell McPherson, Nash J. Cooley, CCI Consulting, LLC and Carlton J. Cooley
Defendant: First American Title Company and First American Financial Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv05552
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #11 as to Defendants First American Financial Corporation, First American Title Company. (lom)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Joseph P. Guglielmo APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of CCI Consulting, LLC, Carlton J. Cooley, Nash J. Cooley and for Mitchell McPherson, designating Marc L Godino as local counsel. (lom)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #11 filed by Plaintiffs CCI Consulting, LLC, Carlton J. Cooley, Nash J. Cooley. (Godino, Marc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Mitchell McPherson pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to First American Financial Corporation, First American Title Company. (Godino, Marc)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs CCI Consulting, LLC, Carlton J. Cooley, Nash J. Cooley, Mitchell McPherson. correcting APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph P. Guglielmo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs CCI Consulting, LLC, Carlton J. Cooley, Nash J. Cooley, Mitchell McPherson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24216934) #12 (Godino, Marc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph P. Guglielmo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs CCI Consulting, LLC, Carlton J. Cooley, Nash J. Cooley, Mitchell McPherson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24216934) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): DC is missing. (lt)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph P. Guglielmo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs CCI Consulting, LLC, Carlton J. Cooley, Nash J. Cooley, Mitchell McPherson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24216934) filed by Plaintiffs CCI Consulting, LLC, Carlton J. Cooley, Nash J. Cooley, Mitchell McPherson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Godino, Marc)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants First American Financial Corporation, First American Title Company amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Mitchell McPherson, Carlton J. Cooley, Nash J. Cooley, CCI Consulting, LLC(Attorney Marc L Godino added to party Carlton J. Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Marc L Godino added to party Nash J. Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Marc L Godino added to party CCI Consulting, LLC(pty:pla))(Godino, Marc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants First American Financial Corporation, First American Title Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kent, Ronald)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-01009 DSF(Ex). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05552 DSF(Ex). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants First American Financial Corporation and First American Title Company. (jtil)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mitchell McPherson, (Godino, Marc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mitchell McPherson. (Godino, Marc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Mitchell McPherson. (Godino, Marc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23985160 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Mitchell McPherson. (Attorney Marc L Godino added to party Mitchell McPherson(pty:pla))(Godino, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell McPherson v. First American Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell McPherson
Represented By: Marc L Godino
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nash J. Cooley
Represented By: Marc L Godino
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CCI Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Marc L Godino
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton J. Cooley
Represented By: Marc L Godino
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?