Paul Reiffer v. Maestro Interactive, Inc.
Plaintiff: Paul Reiffer
Defendant: Maestro Interactive, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05655
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. (See Order for further details) (yl)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-05655 PA(AFMx). (rn)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Paul Reiffer. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (dml)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Paul Reiffer, upon Defendant Maestro Interactive, Inc. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent; Cogency Global, Inc. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Maestro Interactive, Inc. (et)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (Attachments: #1 CV11C- Statement of Consent) (et)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Paul Reiffer. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Paul Reiffer. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Paul Reiffer, (Grossbardt, Jonah)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Paul Reiffer (Grossbardt, Jonah)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Paul Reiffer. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24002882 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Paul Reiffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Registration, #2 Exhibit 2- Infringement) (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Paul Reiffer(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul Reiffer v. Maestro Interactive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Reiffer
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maestro Interactive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?