Xue Ji v. United States Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Xue Ji
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,, Federal Bureau of Investigations (FBI), Department of Justice Office of the Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigations and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv05683
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schonbachler, Katharine)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katharine Schonbachler on behalf of Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigations, United States Department of Justice, United States of America (Attorney Katharine Schonbachler added to party Federal Bureau of Investigations(pty:dft), Attorney Katharine Schonbachler added to party United States Department of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Katharine Schonbachler added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Schonbachler, Katharine)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Xue Ji, upon Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigations served on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by unspecified means. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. /s zhenxiong fan (Fan, Zhenxiong)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Xue Ji, upon Defendant United States Department of Justice served on 7/5/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; United States of America served on 7/5/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by unspecified means. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. /s zhenxiong fan (Fan, Zhenxiong)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, 2 Supplement Notice of Interested Parties, 3 Supplement Notice of Related Cases, 4 Supplement Proposed Summons are attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Federal Bureau of Investigations, United States Department of Justice, United States of America. (ghap)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24007376 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Department of Justice Office of the Attorney General, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,, Federal Bureau of Investigations (FBI). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Supplement Notice of Related Cases, #4 Supplement Proposed Summons) (Attorney Zhenxiong Fan added to party Department of Justice Office of the Attorney General(pty:dft), Attorney Zhenxiong Fan added to party Federal Bureau of Investigations (FBI)(pty:dft), Attorney Zhenxiong Fan added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:dft))(Fan, Zhenxiong)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xue Ji v. United States Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Represented By: Zhenxiong Fan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigations (FBI)
Represented By: Zhenxiong Fan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice Office of the Attorney General
Represented By: Zhenxiong Fan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Katharine Schonbachler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigations
Represented By: Katharine Schonbachler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Katharine Schonbachler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xue Ji
Represented By: Zhenxiong Fan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?