Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust et al v. Sean Richard Clarke
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Contract Administration Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Operating Engineers Workers Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund and Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund
Defendant: Sean Richard Clarke
Case Number: 2:2019cv05785
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sean Richard Clarke answer now due 9/25/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Fund for Construction Industry Advancement; Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust; Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund; Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund; Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund; Contract Administration Fund; Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust; Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust; Operating Engineers Workers Compensation Trust; Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust.(Decker, Marija)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Contract Administration Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Operating Engineers Workers Compensation Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, upon Defendant Sean Richard Clarke served on 8/4/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sean Richard Clarke, an individual DBA S R Clarke Landscape Architecture & Development in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Decker, Marija)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Sean Richard Clarke. (car)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, (Decker, Marija)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Decker, Marija)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Decker, Marija)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24028644 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Contract Administration Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Operating Engineers Workers Compensation Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust. (Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Contract Administration Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Fund for Construction Industry Advancement(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Operating Engineers Workers Compensation Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust(pty:pla))(Decker, Marija)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust et al v. Sean Richard Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Trust
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contract Administration Fund
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fund for Construction Industry Advancement
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Workers Compensation Trust
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Richard Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?