Zeferino Ocampo Fitz v. David Alejandro Venegas Nunez et al
Plaintiff: Zeferino Ocampo Fitz
Defendant: Salvador Venegas Patino, Erick Lara, Jose Julio Valdez Balderas, Jesus Arturo Monsalvo Juarez, Salvador Urieta, Edwin Jesus Garcia, Alejandro Roman Aguilera, Armando Carlos Ascension Quiroz, Enrique Rojas Campos, Francisco Olguin, Agustin Perea, David Alejandro Venegas Nunez and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv05806
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1127
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Alejandro Roman Aguilera, Armando Carlos Ascension Quiroz, Jesus Arturo Monsalvo Juarez, Francisco Olguin, Agustin Perea, Salvador Urieta, Jose Julio Valdez Balderas, David Alejandro Venegas Nunez, Salvador Venegas Patino, (Lopez, Anthony)
August 30, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Alejandro Roman Aguilera, Armando Carlos Ascension Quiroz, Jesus Arturo Monsalvo Juarez, Francisco Olguin, Agustin Perea, Salvador Urieta, Jose Julio Valdez Balderas, David Alejandro Venegas Nunez, Salvador Venegas Patino.(Attorney Anthony R Lopez added to party Alejandro Roman Aguilera(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony R Lopez added to party Armando Carlos Ascension Quiroz(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony R Lopez added to party Jesus Arturo Monsalvo Juarez(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony R Lopez added to party Francisco Olguin(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony R Lopez added to party Agustin Perea(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony R Lopez added to party Salvador Urieta(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony R Lopez added to party Jose Julio Valdez Balderas(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony R Lopez added to party David Alejandro Venegas Nunez(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony R Lopez added to party Salvador Venegas Patino(pty:dft))(Lopez, Anthony)
August 30, 2019 Filing 23 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Salvador Urieta, Jose Julio Valdez Balderas, David Alejandro Venegas Nunez, Salvador Venegas Patino (bm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 22 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Alejandro Roman Aguilera, Armando Carlos Ascension Quiroz, Jesus Arturo Monsalvo Juarez, Francisco Olguin, Agustin Perea (bm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendants Alejandro Roman Aguilera, Armando Carlos Ascension Quiroz, Jesus Arturo Monsalvo Juarez, Francisco Olguin, Agustin Perea, Salvador Urieta, Jose Julio Valdez Balderas, David Alejandro Venegas Nunez, Salvador Venegas Patino filed by plaintiff Zeferino Ocampo Fitz. (Eyre, Steven)
August 29, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zeferino Ocampo Fitz, upon Defendant Francisco Olguin served on 7/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Francisco Olguin in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Eyre, Steven)
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zeferino Ocampo Fitz, upon Defendant Salvador Urieta served on 7/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Salvador Urieta in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Eyre, Steven)
August 29, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zeferino Ocampo Fitz, upon Defendant Armando Carlos Ascension Quiroz served on 7/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Armando Carlos Ascension Quiroz in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Eyre, Steven)
August 29, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zeferino Ocampo Fitz, upon Defendant Jose Julio Valdez Balderas served on 7/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jose Julio Valdez Balderas in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Eyre, Steven)
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zeferino Ocampo Fitz, upon Defendant Jesus Arturo Monsalvo Juarez served on 7/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jesus Arturo Monsalvo Juarez in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Eyre, Steven)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zeferino Ocampo Fitz, upon Defendant Alejandro Roman Aguilera served on 7/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alejandro Roman Aguilera in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Eyre, Steven)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zeferino Ocampo Fitz, upon Defendant Agustin Perea served on 7/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agustin Perea in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Eyre, Steven)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zeferino Ocampo Fitz, upon Defendant Salvador Venegas Patino served on 7/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Salvador Venegas Patio in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Eyre, Steven)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zeferino Ocampo Fitz, upon Defendant David Alejandro Venegas Nunez served on 7/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Alejandro Venegas Nuez in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Eyre, Steven)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Alejandro Roman Aguilera answer now due 8/28/2019; Armando Carlos Ascension Quiroz answer now due 8/28/2019; Jesus Arturo Monsalvo Juarez answer now due 8/28/2019; Francisco Olguin answer now due 8/28/2019; Agustin Perea answer now due 8/28/2019; Salvador Urieta answer now due 8/28/2019; Jose Julio Valdez Balderas answer now due 8/28/2019; David Alejandro Venegas Nunez answer now due 8/28/2019; Salvador Venegas Patino answer now due 8/28/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Zeferino Ocampo Fitz.(Eyre, Steven)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Alejandro Roman Aguilera, Armando Carlos Ascension Quiroz, Edwin Jesus Garcia, Erick Lara, Jesus Arturo Monsalvo Juarez, Francisco Olguin, Agustin Perea, Enrique Rojas Campos, Salvador Urieta, Jose Julio Valdez Balderas, David Alejandro Venegas Nunez, Salvador Venegas Patino. (car)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Zeferino Ocampo Fitz. (Eyre, Steven)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (car)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Zeferino Ocampo Fitz, (Eyre, Steven)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Zeferino Ocampo Fitz. (Eyre, Steven)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Zeferino Ocampo Fitz. (Eyre, Steven)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24033776 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Zeferino Ocampo Fitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Steven J Eyre added to party Zeferino Ocampo Fitz(pty:pla))(Eyre, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeferino Ocampo Fitz v. David Alejandro Venegas Nunez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Venegas Patino
Represented By: Anthony R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erick Lara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Julio Valdez Balderas
Represented By: Anthony R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Arturo Monsalvo Juarez
Represented By: Anthony R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Urieta
Represented By: Anthony R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Jesus Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Roman Aguilera
Represented By: Anthony R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Carlos Ascension Quiroz
Represented By: Anthony R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Rojas Campos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Olguin
Represented By: Anthony R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agustin Perea
Represented By: Anthony R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Alejandro Venegas Nunez
Represented By: Anthony R Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeferino Ocampo Fitz
Represented By: Steven J Eyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?