Lara Whitten v. Screen Actors Guild - American Federal of Television and Radio Artists et al
Plaintiff: Lara Whitten
Defendant: Gabrielle Carteris, David White, Does 1 to 50 and Screen Actors Guild - American Federal of Television and Radio Artists
Case Number: 2:2019cv05818
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Granting #18 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (gk)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE ENTRY OF EXHIBIT 1 by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 8/21/2019, Plaintiff filed an "Entry of Exhibit 1," wherein she claims she was "overwhelmed" and "depressed" when Defendants removed the action to this Court, and asserts that she has "many court dates to appear on this summer" #17 . Out of an abundance of caution and in light of Plaintiffs pro se status, the Court sua sponte CONTINUES Plaintiff's deadline to file a First Amended Complaint, or inform Defendants and the Court of her intention not to do so, to 9/13/2019. Failure to timely comply with this Order or file a timely response to any subsequent motions, will result in the dismissal of this action. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Lara Whitten. (yl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (yl).
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY OF EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff Lara Whitten. (yl)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Lara Whitten on 8/21/19 the Entry of Exhibit 1 was served. (yl)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #12 and VACATES the 8/30/2019 hearing. Plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint, or inform Defendants and the Court of her intention not to do so, within 15 days of the date of this Order. Failure to timely comply with this Order or file a timely response to any subsequent motions will result in the dismissal of this action. Defendants shall file their response within 15 days after the filing of any amended complaint. The Scheduling Conference is VACATED and will be reset, if necessary, when the pleadings are at issue. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 DEFENDANTS REQUEST THAT UNOPPOSED MOTION BE GRANTED re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #12 filed by Defendants Gabrielle Carteris, Screen Actors Guild - American Federal of Television and Radio Artists, David White. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Wojciechowski, Jason)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court sua sponte continues the scheduling conference from August 23, 2019 to August 30, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendants Gabrielle Carteris, Does, Screen Actors Guild - American Federal of Television and Radio Artists, David White. Motion set for hearing on 8/30/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Wojciechowski, #2 Declaration of David Gregoire, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service) (Wojciechowski, Jason)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason Wojciechowski counsel for Defendants Gabrielle Carteris, Does, Screen Actors Guild - American Federal of Television and Radio Artists, David White. Adding Jason Wojciechowski as counsel of record for SCREEN ACTORS GUILD-AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TELEVISION AND RADIO ARTISTS, GABRIELLE CARTERIS, AND DAVID WHITE, for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant SCREEN ACTORS GUILD-AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TELEVISION AND RADIO ARTISTS, GABRIELLE CARTERIS, AND DAVID WHITE,. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Jason Wojciechowski added to party Gabrielle Carteris(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Wojciechowski added to party Does(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Wojciechowski added to party Screen Actors Guild - American Federal of Television and Radio Artists(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Wojciechowski added to party David White(pty:dft))(Wojciechowski, Jason)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Electronic Filing re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #9 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 e-mailed to mccoy@bushgottlieb.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'Invalid Recipient - https://community.mimecast.com/docs/DOC-1369#550 [ywwr5SjYOt-4q0HSSVjqBw.us3]' (delivery attempts: 0). The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/9/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/23/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The pro se litigants email address was added to CM/ECF in error upon the opening of this Notice of Removal case. The pro se litigants email will be removed from CM/ECF and will not be used for electronic service without the appropriate registration and consent. See Local Rule 5-3. (esa)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Western Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to John E. McDermott. New Case Number 2:19-cv-05818 DMG (JEMx). (esa)
July 2, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF GENERAL DENIAL to Complaint filed by defendants Gabrielle Carteris, Screen Actors Guild - American Federal of Television and Radio Artists, David White. (Filed in state court 7/2/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 10)(esa)
July 2, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Gabrielle Carteris, Does, Screen Actors Guild - American Federal of Television and Radio Artists, David White, filed by plaintiff Lara Whitten. (Filed in state court 5/2/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, (Gottlieb, Ira)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Gabrielle Carteris, Screen Actors Guild - American Federal of Television and Radio Artists, David White. (Gottlieb, Ira)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT, Central District, case number 19STCV15383 Receipt No: 0973-24023969 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants David White, Gabrielle Carteris, Screen Actors Guild - American Federal of Television and Radio Artists. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Proof of Service) (Attorney Ira Lawrence Gottlieb added to party Gabrielle Carteris(pty:dft), Attorney Ira Lawrence Gottlieb added to party Screen Actors Guild - American Federal of Television and Radio Artists(pty:dft), Attorney Ira Lawrence Gottlieb added to party David White(pty:dft))(Gottlieb, Ira)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lara Whitten v. Screen Actors Guild - American Federal of Television and Radio Artists et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabrielle Carteris
Represented By: Garrett Arthur McCoy
Represented By: Lisa C Demidovich
Represented By: Ira Lawrence Gottlieb
Represented By: Jason Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David White
Represented By: Garrett Arthur McCoy
Represented By: Lisa C Demidovich
Represented By: Ira Lawrence Gottlieb
Represented By: Jason Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50
Represented By: Jason Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Screen Actors Guild - American Federal of Television and Radio Artists
Represented By: Garrett Arthur McCoy
Represented By: Lisa C Demidovich
Represented By: Ira Lawrence Gottlieb
Represented By: Jason Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lara Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?