Michael Watkins et al v. Woodridge Productions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Watkins and Watkins Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Jordan Feiner, DOES 1 through 60, inclusive, William Roe, Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc, Woodridge Productions, Inc. and Laura Benson
Case Number: 2:2019cv05821
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Farida Ali APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Watkins and Watkins Productions, Inc., designating H Mark Madnick as local counsel. (bm)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Michael J Collins APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Watkins and Watkins Productions, Inc., designating H Mark Madnick as local counsel. (bm)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Farida Ali to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Watkins, Watkins Productions, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24169334) filed by Plaintiff Michael Watkins, Watkins Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Madnick, Harris)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Collins to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Watkins, Watkins Productions, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24169146) filed by Plaintiff Michael Watkins, Watkins Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Madnick, Harris)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2020 at 02:00 PM. (wm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants William Roe, Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc, Woodridge Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wasserman, Mark)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 Amended CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc, Woodridge Productions, Inc., identifying Woodridge Productions, Inc.; Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.; Sony Corporation of America; Sony Corporation; Michael Watkins; Watkins Productions, Inc.; Kramar Madnick, LLP; Brewer Attorneys & Counselors; William Roe; Laura Benson; and, Jordan Feiner. (Wasserman, Mark)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Compliance re Removal filed by Defendants William Roe, Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc, Woodridge Productions, Inc.. (Wasserman, Mark)
July 5, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants William Roe, Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc, and Woodridge Productions, Inc., attached as Exhibit 9. (jtil)
July 5, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Watkins Productions, Inc., and Michael Watkins in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/30/2019, attached as Exhibit 5. (jtil)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants William Roe, Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc, Woodridge Productions, Inc., re Joinder (non-motion) #3 , Declaration #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 served on July 5, 2019. (Wasserman, Mark)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants William Roe, Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc, Woodridge Productions, Inc., identifying Michael Watkins; Watkins Productions, Inc.; Kramar Madnick, LLP; Brewer Attorneys & Counselors; Woodridge Productions, Inc.; Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.; William Roe; Defendant Laura Benson; and Jordan Feiner. (Attorney Mark Andrew Wasserman added to party William Roe(pty:dft))(Wasserman, Mark)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants William Roe, Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc, Woodridge Productions, Inc.. (Wasserman, Mark)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 JOINDER filed by Defendant William Roe joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 . (Wasserman, Mark)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Mark Wasserman re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc, Woodridge Productions, Inc.. (Wasserman, Mark)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19SMCV00305 Receipt No: 0973-24039635 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc, Woodridge Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Summons, #2 Exhibit 2: Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3: Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4: Notice of Case Assignment, #5 Exhibit 5: First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice of Farida Ali, #7 Exhibit 7: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Collins, #8 Exhibit 8: Proofs of Service, #9 Exhibit 9: Defendants' Answer to Complaint, #10 Exhibit 10: Director's Deal Memorandum, #11 Exhibit 11: Relevant Excerpts of the 2017-2020 Collective Bargaining Agreement) (Attorney Mark Andrew Wasserman added to party Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Andrew Wasserman added to party Woodridge Productions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wasserman, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Watkins et al v. Woodridge Productions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Feiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 60, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Roe
Represented By: Mark Andrew Wasserman
Represented By: Irina Constantin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc
Represented By: Mark Andrew Wasserman
Represented By: Irina Constantin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodridge Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Andrew Wasserman
Represented By: Irina Constantin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Watkins
Represented By: Farida Ali
Represented By: Harris Mark Madnick
Represented By: Steven D Kramar
Represented By: Michael J Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Watkins Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Farida Ali
Represented By: Harris Mark Madnick
Represented By: Steven D Kramar
Represented By: Michael J Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?