Elaine Machitar v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Elaine Machitar
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv05828
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying MetLife, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Hess, Robert)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, (Hess, Robert)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Hess, Robert)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company answer now due 8/28/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Attorney Robert E Hess added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Hess, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Elaine Machitar, upon Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Damonte, Intake Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Gavidia, Cesar)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (esa)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Elaine Machitar, (Gavidia, Cesar)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Elaine Machitar. (Gavidia, Cesar)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Elaine Machitar. (Gavidia, Cesar)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24040889 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Elaine Machitar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Disability policy) (Attorney Cesar Gavidia added to party Elaine Machitar(pty:pla))(Gavidia, Cesar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elaine Machitar v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Machitar
Represented By: Cesar Gavidia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?