Sara Situ v. American First National Bank et al
Plaintiff: Sara Situ
Defendant: Henry Wu, Joanne You, American First National Bank and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv05846
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (shb)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re: Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint #11 ; and Plaintiffs Motion toRemand #12 ; Defendants Wu and Yous Motion to Dismiss #10 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion to Amend; GRANTS Plaintiffs Motionto Remand; and DENIES as MOOT Defendant Wu and Yous Motion to Dismiss. This case is remanded to the Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case No. 19STCV19564.The clerk shall close this case. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (shb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Pleadings #11 and Motion to Remand #12 scheduled for 8/20/19 10:00 am are hereby taken off calendar and under submission. No appearances are necessary.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY in Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Defendants Henry Wu and Joanne You for lack of personal jurisdiction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #10 filed by Defendants American First National Bank, Henry Wu, Joanne You. (Mai, Tunanah)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 OPPOSITION Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Defendants Henry Wu and Joanne You for lack of personal jurisdiction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #10 filed by Plaintiff Sara Situ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kousha Berokim)(Satar, Yalda)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Complaint #11 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #12 filed by Defendants American First National Bank, Henry Wu, Joanne You. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Leave and Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 - Agency Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Original Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 - July 12 Email, #5 Exhibit 4- Proposed Amended Complaint)(Mai, Tunanah)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Sara Situ. Motion set for hearing on 8/20/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yalda Satar) (Satar, Yalda)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Sara Situ. Motion set for hearing on 8/20/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yalda Satar, #2 Exhibit) (Satar, Yalda)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Defendants Henry Wu and Joanne You for lack of personal jurisdiction , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by defendants American First National Bank, Henry Wu, Joanne You. Motion set for hearing on 8/27/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Declaration of Joanne You, #3 Declaration Declaration of Henry Wu) (Mai, Tunanah)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants American First National Bank, Henry Wu, Joanne You. (Mai, Tunanah)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Amended Document (Non-Motion), #5 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect form was e-filed as the Civil Cover Sheet. The correct form is number CV-71 Civil Cover Sheet. In addition the incorrect event was selected in e-filing the Amended Notice of Removal. The Clerk has modified the docket entry to reflect the true event. (car)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
July 9, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants American First National Bank, Does 1 through 25, inclusive, Henry Wu, Joanne You. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Sara Situ. Filed in State Court on 6/4/19 Submitted with attachment 10 to Amended Notice of Removal #5 (car)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 [AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL] FILED AS AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Movants American First National Bank, Henry Wu, Joanne You. Amendment to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Joanne You, #2 Declaration Declaration of Henry Wu, #3 Appendix Case Report, #4 Appendix Index of State Pleadings, #5 Exhibit Notice of Jury Fee Posting, #6 Exhibit Order to Show Cause, #7 Exhibit Notice of Case Management Conference, #8 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Exhibit Summons, #10 Exhibit Original Complaint, #11 Exhibit Notice of Case Assignment)(Mai, Pete) Modified on 7/9/2019 (car).
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tuananh (Pete) Lam Mai to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movants American First National Bank, Henry Wu, Joanne You (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24048619) filed by defendants American First National Bank, Henry Wu, Joanne You. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Mai, Pete)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants American First National Bank, Henry Wu, Joanne You, identifying American First National Bank. (Mai, Pete)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants American First National Bank, Henry Wu, Joanne You. (Mai, Pete)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, case number 19STCV19564 Receipt No: 0973-24044245 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants American First National Bank, Joanne You, Henry Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Joanne You, #2 Appendix Case Report, #3 Appendix Index of Pleadings, #4 Exhibit Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, #5 Exhibit Order to Show Cause, #6 Exhibit Notice of Case Management Conference, #7 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Exhibit Summons, #9 Exhibit Original Complaint, #10 Exhibit Notice of Case Assignment) (Attorney Pete Tuananh Mai added to party American First National Bank(pty:bkmov), Attorney Pete Tuananh Mai added to party Henry Wu(pty:bkmov), Attorney Pete Tuananh Mai added to party Joanne You(pty:bkmov))(Mai, Pete)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sara Situ v. American First National Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Wu
Represented By: James Phi Dao Lam
Represented By: Tunanah Mai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne You
Represented By: James Phi Dao Lam
Represented By: Tunanah Mai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American First National Bank
Represented By: James Phi Dao Lam
Represented By: Tunanah Mai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Situ
Represented By: Jasmine A Duel
Represented By: Kousha Berokim
Represented By: Yalda Satar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?