Lather, Inc. v. Gilchrist and Soames, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lather, Inc.
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc., Gilchrist & Soames, Inc. and Gilchrist and Soames, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05868
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Celebrity Cruises Inc. answer now due 9/6/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lather, Inc..(Holbrow, Willmore)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Celebrity Cruises Inc., Gilchrist and Soames, Inc. (esa)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (esa)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Lather, Inc.. (Holbrow, Willmore)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lather, Inc., (Holbrow, Willmore)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lather, Inc.. (Holbrow, Willmore)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lather, Inc.. (Holbrow, Willmore)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24047626 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lather, Inc.. (Attorney Willmore F Holbrow, III added to party Lather, Inc.(pty:pla))(Holbrow, Willmore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lather, Inc. v. Gilchrist and Soames, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Rossi Townes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilchrist & Soames, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilchrist and Soames, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lather, Inc.
Represented By: Willmore F Holbrow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?