John Peterman v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: John Peterman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv05882
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Proof of Service #19 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) #20 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by no later than September 13, 2019. Counsel is ordered to file an Amended Proof of Service that includes the following: Title page and the date of service. Please contact the Help Desk at (213) 894-0242 or ecf-helpdesk@cacd.uscourts.gov for assistance in properly e-filing the document (hr)
August 28, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA, #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. See Local Rule 11-3.8 Title Page. The date of service was not entered during the filing sequence, therefore, neither the service date or answer date appear in the final docket text. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Peterman, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Ramer, Dominique)
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) #17 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #16 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Counsel is ordered to file an Amended Proof of Service that cures the deficiency listed on docket entry no. 17. (hr)
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (60 days); Title page is missing. See Local Rule 11-3.8 Title Page. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plantiff John Peterman, (Ramer, Dominique)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (see document for details) (Attachments: #1 Blank Consent Form) (hr)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (hr)
August 13, 2019 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. 0973-24250391 for $400 filing fee. (Ramer, Dominique)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: 1. The case number is incomplete. The correct case number is 2:19-cv-05882-DOC-AS. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plantiff John Peterman. (Ramer, Dominique)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: denying #8 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby: DENIED, with leave to amend within 30 days. Plaintiff may re-submit the IFP application and Complaint to this Court. Plaintiff shall utilize the same case number. If plaintiff fails to submit the required documents within 30 days, this case shall be DISMISSED unless plaintiff pays the filing fees in full. (see document for further details) (hr)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff John Peterman. (Ramer, Dominique)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #7 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Please also add Judge's initials next to the case number. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff John Peterman. (Ramer, Dominique)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff John Peterman. (Ramer, Dominique)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff John Peterman, identifying Pond Lehocky Stern Giordano Disability. (Ramer, Dominique)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff John Peterman. (Ramer, Dominique)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening #3 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. -Plaintiff is ordered to file the following documents forthwith: *Notice of Interested Parties; *Civil Cover Sheet; *Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Utilize correct form CV-60); *Request for Summons. (see document for further details). (hr)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. The Civil Cover Sheet and Application for In Forma Pauperis were incorrectly filed as attachments. Please utilize CM/ECF resources such as the search tool to locate the appropriate events for filing. No further action is required unless directed by the Court. (jtil)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plantiff John Peterman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Signed Application, #3 Exhibit) (Attorney Dominique Venna Ramer added to party John Peterman(pty:pla))(Ramer, Dominique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Peterman v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Peterman
Represented By: Dominique Venna Ramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?