Fadi Haddad v. California Department of Corrections
Petitioner: FADI HADDAD
Respondent: California Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2019cv05883
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: granting #9 APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File. IT IS ORDERED that Respondent is granted to and including September 23, 2019, to file a Motion to Dismiss, and to and including October 7, 2019, to file an Answer to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (hr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File A MOTION TO DISMISS AND AN ANSWER TO THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DECLARATION OF DAVID E. MADEO filed by Respondent California Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Madeo, David)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Elgin Madeo on behalf of Respondent California Department of Corrections (Attorney David Elgin Madeo added to party California Department of Corrections(pty:res))(Madeo, David)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Respondent shall e-file and serve a Notice of Appearance that designates the Deputy Attorney General(s) in charge of the case within fourteen (14) days of the service date of this Order. Respondent shall file a Motion to Dismiss within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Respondent shall file and serve an Answer to Petition within forty-five (45) days of the date of this Order. Petitioner may file a single Reply responding to matters raised in the Answer within thirty (30) days of the date of service thereof. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Blank Consent) (kh)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody (28 USC 2254). Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (ghap)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #1 . Due to clerical error. The docket clerk closed the case in error for failure of payment. Case will be reopen. (ghap)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 In response to the opening of this case, the Clerk issued a Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Attorney Case Opening. The Notice indicated that unless counsel corrected the identified discrepancy within two business days, the docket for this case number would be closed and no further filings would be permitted under this case number. Counsel has not corrected the discrepancy. Accordingly, this case is now closed. No further filings may be made under this case number, except, if applicable, to request a refund of fees using a Form G-124, Application for Refund of Fees. Should you wish to pursue this action, a new case must be filed and a new case number issued. (Case Terminated.) (ghap)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #1 . The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (ghap)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody (28 USC 2254), Receipt Number 0973-24064018 - Fee:$5, Fee Exempt pursuant to statue, filed by PETITIONER FADI HADDAD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET) (Attorney Leonard Emil Chaitin added to party FADI HADDAD(pty:pet))(Chaitin, Leonard) Modified on 7/23/2019 (ghap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fadi Haddad v. California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FADI HADDAD
Represented By: Leonard Emil Chaitin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California Department of Corrections
Represented By: David Elgin Madeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?