Susan Spell v. Natalie Stone et al
Petitioner: Susan Spell
Respondent: Natalie Stone, Brian Evans and County of Los Angeles
Case Number: 2:2019cv05886
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 26 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 19-56070 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #25 as to Petitioner Susan Spell. (sbou)
September 9, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Petitioner Susan Spell. Appeal of Judgment, #24 Filed On: 8/8/19; Entered On: 8/9/19; Certificate of Appelability has been ruled on 8/8/19, see item 23. (mat)
August 8, 2019 Filing 24 JUDGMENT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, in favor of County of Los Angeles, Brian Evans, Natalie Stone against Susan Spell Related to: Order Dismissing Case, #23 . IT IS ADJUDGED that the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus and this actionare dismissed without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (sbou)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SUMMARILY DISMISSING PETITION AND ACTION, DENYING REQUESTS FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, AND DENYING A CERTIFICATE OFAPPEALABILITY by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: (1) the Petition and this action are dismissed without prejudice; (2) petitioner's request for the appointment of counsel is denied; and (3) petitioner's requests for judicial notice of her various exhibits are denied. (See document for details.) (sbou)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE AND TAKING MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. On July 30, 2019, petitioner also filed two copies of a "Notice of Motion and Motion for Judicial Notice in Support of [Petition]" ("Motion") which reflect that the Motion is noticed for hearing before this Court on August 27, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. (Docket Nos. 17-18). The August 27, 2019 hearing date is hereby VACATED. The matters argued in the Motion (and petitioner's multiple other submissions) are more properly considered in conjunction with the Petition itself, thus all of the foregoing matters are submitted for decision without a hearing. (See document for details.) (sbou)
August 5, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #3 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (sbou)
July 30, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Susan Spell. (sbou)
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION in Support of Motion for Judicial Notice #17 filed by Petitioner Susan Spell. (sbou)
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: M. A. Melinda Wallace, aka Melinda Murphy filed by Petitioner Susan Spell. (sbou)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Petitioner Susan Spell. (sbou)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 EXHIBITS D - F Filed filed by Petitioner Susan Spell. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(sbou)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 EXHIBIT A & B Filed filed by Petitioner Susan Spell. (sbou)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 EXHIBITS J - M Filed filed by Petitioner Susan Spell. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3)(sbou)
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 EXHIBITS G - I Filed filed by Petitioner Susan Spell. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5)(sbou)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Melinda Wallace filed by Petitioner Susan Spell. (sbou)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) VACATING HEARING DATE AND TAKING MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: As petitioner has not properly noticed any motion for a July 23, 2019 hearing date, and as the matters argued in the Memo and exhibits are more properly considered in conjunction with the Petition itself, all of the foregoing matters are submitted for decision without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly any hearing noticed/set for July 23, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby VACATED. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (klg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 EXHIBIT C of Motion for Judicial Notice in Support of Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 filed by Petitioner Susan Spell. (klg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 EXHIBIT A and B in Motion for Judicial Notice in Support of Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 filed by Petitioner Susan Spell. (klg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Judicial Notice of Exhibits in Support of Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Susan Spell. (sbou)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Melinda Murphy filed by Petitioner Susan Spell. (sbou)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge - Non-Final #5 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect form was filed by the Petitioner, the correct form is CV 11 and for the Petitioners convenience, attached is the correct form. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (Attachments: #1 CV 11) (rn)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitioner Susan Spell. (rn)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (car)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Susan Spell. (car)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION In Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) #1 filed by Petitioner Susan Spell. (car)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian.(Filing fee $ 5 FEE PAID), filed by Petitioner Susan Spell. (car) Modified on 7/10/2019 (car).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Susan Spell v. Natalie Stone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Natalie Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: County of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Susan Spell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?