Jeffrey Thompson v. Patrick Covello et al
Petitioner: Jeffrey Thompson
Respondent: Patrick Covello and Kamala Harris
Case Number: 2:2019cv05891
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick Re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), #1 . IT IS RECOMMENDED that the District Judge issue an Order: (1) accepting this Report and Recommendation; and (2) dismissing this action without prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Court's Order to Show Cause) (nbo)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Objections to R&R due by 9/19/2019. (nbo)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause Why Petition Should Not Be Dismissed by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Petitioner is therefore ORDERED to show cause in writing within 14 days of the date of this order why the Court should not dismiss this action for lack of jurisdiction. (See document for details.) (sbou)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV38, #2 CV111) (jtil)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Case transferred to the Central District of California, Western Division. Files transferred electronically to: *Central District of California, Western Division*.*350 West 1st Street, Suite 4311**Los Angeles, CA 90012-4565*. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 7/10/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffrey Thompson. (jms) [Transferred from California Southern on 7/10/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Patrick Covello, Kamala Harris, filed by Jeffrey Thompson.($5 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1220-H-BGS. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(jms) [Transferred from California Southern on 7/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffrey Thompson v. Patrick Covello et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Covello
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kamala Harris
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?