Karen Bird v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Karen Bird
Defendant: Amgen, Inc. LTD Plan and Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv05903
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting #14 Request to Substitute Attorney Dennis Rhodes as attorney of record instead of Attorney Mia D Farber for Amgen, Inc., Ltd. Plan. (lom)
September 5, 2019 Filing 17 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/4/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 Defendants CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Attorney Dennis J Rhodes added to party Amgen, Inc. LTD Plan(pty:dft))(Rhodes, Dennis)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Amgen, Inc. Ltd Plan and filed by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company.(Rhodes, Dennis)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Dennis Rhodes in place of attorney Mia Farber filed by Defendant Amgen, Inc. LTD Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney or Withdrawal of Counsel) (Farber, Mia)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company answer now due 9/2/2019, filed by Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company.(Attorney Dennis J Rhodes added to party Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Rhodes, Dennis)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) by Judge Dolly M. Gee: IT IS ORDERED, based upon the parties' Stipulation #11 that the deadline for Defendant Amgen, Inc. to respond to the Complaint is extended to 9/1/2019. (gk)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amgen, Inc. LTD Plan answer now due 9/3/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Amgen, Inc. LTD Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by 30 Days)(Attorney Mia D Farber added to party Amgen, Inc. LTD Plan(pty:dft))(Farber, Mia)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karen Bird, upon Defendant Amgen, Inc. LTD Plan served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Barbara Mitchell - paralegal in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brehm, Brent)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karen Bird, upon Defendant Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent, by serving - Gabriela Sanchez, Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brehm, Brent)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Amgen, Inc. LTD Plan, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (ghap)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Karen Bird, (Kantor, Glenn)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Karen Bird. (Kantor, Glenn)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Karen Bird. (Kantor, Glenn)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24055815 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Karen Bird. (Attorney Glenn R Kantor added to party Karen Bird(pty:pla))(Kantor, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karen Bird v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amgen, Inc. LTD Plan
Represented By: Mia D Farber
Represented By: Dennis J Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Dennis J Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Bird
Represented By: Glenn R Kantor
Represented By: Brent Dorian Brehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?