Los Padres Forestwatch et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: Earth Island Institute, Center For Biological Diversity and Los Padres Forestwatch
Defendant: United States Forest Service, United States Fish and Wildlife Service and Kevin B. Elliott
Case Number: 2:2019cv05925
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Los Padres Forestwatch, Center For Biological Diversity, Earth Island Institute, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to William Barr. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to United States Forest Service; Kevin B. Elliott; United States Fish and Wildlife Service. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Augustine, Justin)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sean Christian Duffy on behalf of Defendants Kevin B. Elliott, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service (Attorney Sean Christian Duffy added to party Kevin B. Elliott (pty:dft), Attorney Sean Christian Duffy added to party United States Fish and Wildlife Service(pty:dft), Attorney Sean Christian Duffy added to party United States Forest Service(pty:dft))(Duffy, Sean)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Earth Island Institute, Los Padres Forestwatch, Mountain Communities for Fire Safety. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-6539-CAS-AFM (Voss, Rene)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Kevin B. Elliott, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service. (car)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (car)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Center For Biological Diversity, Earth Island Institute, Los Padres Forestwatch. (Augustine, Justin)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Center For Biological Diversity, Earth Island Institute, Los Padres Forestwatch, (Augustine, Justin)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Center For Biological Diversity, Earth Island Institute, Los Padres Forestwatch. (Augustine, Justin)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (400.00 paid on 07/10/2019, receipt number 0973-24056833), filed by Plaintiff Los Padres Forestwatch, Center For Biological Diversity, Earth Island Institute. (Attorney Justin Augustine added to party Center For Biological Diversity(pty:pla), Attorney Justin Augustine added to party Earth Island Institute(pty:pla), Attorney Justin Augustine added to party Los Padres Forestwatch(pty:pla))(Augustine, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Los Padres Forestwatch et al v. United States Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin B. Elliott
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earth Island Institute
Represented By: Brian P Segee
Represented By: Justin Augustine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Brian P Segee
Represented By: Justin Augustine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Padres Forestwatch
Represented By: Brian P Segee
Represented By: Justin Augustine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?