Robert Lewis, Jr. v. Ronald Davis
Petitioner: Robert Lewis and Robert Lewis, Jr.
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Case Number: 2:2019cv05942
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Louis W Karlin on behalf of Respondent Ronald Davis (Attorney Louis W Karlin added to party Ronald Davis(pty:res))(Karlin, Louis)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Petitioner's counsel has failed to provide the courtesy copy pursuant to the Judge's Procedures and Schedules (http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-alka-sagar). Counsel is ordered to submit the required courtesy copy by no later than 12:00 p.m. on July 18, 2019. re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (afe) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION (28 U.S.C. 2254) by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Before July 30, 2019, Respondent shall file and serve a Notice of Appearance. If Respondent contends that the Petition can be decided without the Court's reaching the merits of Petitioner's claims, Respondent shall file a Motion to Dismiss on or before August 14, 2019. If Respondent does not contend that the Petition can be decided without the Court reaching the merits of Petitioner's claims, Respondent shall file and serve an Answer to the Petition on or before September 13, 2019. (See Order for complete details) Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Part 1, #3 Part 2, #4 Part 3, #5 Part 4, #6 Part 5, #7 Part 6, #8 Part 7, #9 Consent Form (Blank)) (afe)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (jtil)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Robert Lewis. (Sanger, Robert)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody (28 USC 2254), Receipt No. 0973-24060714 for $5 filing fee, filed by Petitioner Robert Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-16, #2 Excerpts of the Record Part 1 of 4, #3 Excerpts of the Record Part 2 of 4, #4 Excerpts of the Record Part 3 of 4, #5 Excerpts of the Record Part 4 of 4, #6 Excerpts of Clerk's Transcript Part 1 of 2, #7 Excerpts of Clerk's Transcript Part 2 of 2) (Attorney Robert M Sanger added to party Robert Lewis(pty:bkmov))(Sanger, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Lewis, Jr. v. Ronald Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Lewis
Represented By: Robert M Sanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Lewis, Jr.
Represented By: Robert M Sanger
Represented By: Stephen K Dunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Davis
Represented By: Louis W Karlin
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?