Michele Ann Hurley v. Andrew M. Saul
Plaintiff: Michele Ann Hurley
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv05954
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Michele Ann Hurley, re Order, #10 served on 7/15/19. (Lowenstein, Janna)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michele Ann Hurley, upon Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 7/18/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F. Dela Rosa. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Yania Llamas. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Lowenstein, Janna)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-5954 JPR on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Attorney Timothy R Bolin added to party Andrew M. Saul(pty:dft))(Bolin, Timothy)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE re No Potential Conflict of Interest filed by Plaintiff Michele Ann Hurley. (Lowenstein, Janna)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Michele Ann Hurley. (Lowenstein, Janna)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Plaintiff must electronically file a proof of service showing compliance with this paragraph within 30 days of the date of this order or as soon as service is timely completed. (See document for details.) (sbou)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order re Possible Conflicts of Interest by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. No later than seven days from the date of this order, Plaintiff's counsel must file notice that ALJ Rosenbluth did or did not participate in or preside over Plaintiff's case. (See document for details.) (sbou)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Andrew M. Saul. (sbou)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sbou)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Michele Ann Hurley. (Lowenstein, Janna)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michele Ann Hurley. (Lowenstein, Janna)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michele Ann Hurley, identifying United States Social Security Administration. (Lowenstein, Janna)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michele Ann Hurley. (Lowenstein, Janna)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Michele Ann Hurley. (Attorney Janna K Lowenstein added to party Michele Ann Hurley(pty:pla))(Lowenstein, Janna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michele Ann Hurley v. Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Timothy R Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Ann Hurley
Represented By: Janna K Lowenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?