Eric Allione v. Salient CRGT, Inc.
Plaintiff: Allione Eric and Eric Allione
Defendant: Salient CRGT, Inc.a Maryland Corporation, DOES 1 through 25, inclusive and Salient CRGT, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv06012
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (cw)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby VACATES the hearing. Jury Trial is set for 10/13/20 at 9:00 AM; the Final Pretrial Conference/Motions in Limine hearing is set for 9/25/20 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for other deadlines and requirements.* (cw)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Eric Allione.. (Lovretovich, Joseph)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-06012 FMO(JPRx). (rn)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Salient CRGT, Inc.a Maryland Corporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Related Case(s) #3 served on 7/15/19. (Lavi, Rachael)
July 12, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Salient CRGT, Inc. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 7/11/2019, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
July 12, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Eric Allione in Los Angeles Superior Court on 4/25/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Salient CRGT, Inc.a Maryland Corporation identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Lavi, Rachael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Salient CRGT, Inc.a Maryland Corporation, identifying Plaintiff Eric Allione; Defendant Salient CRGT, Inc.. (Lavi, Rachael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Salient CRGT, Inc.a Maryland Corporation. Related Case(s): NONE (Lavi, Rachael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Salient CRGT, Inc.a Maryland Corporation. (Lavi, Rachael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV14515 Receipt No: 0973-24074224 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Salient CRGT, Inc.a Maryland Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Claire Morse In Support Of Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #2 Declaration of Rachael Lavi In Support Of Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #3 Exhibit A (Complaint) to Declaration of of Rachael Lavi In Support Of Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #4 Exhibit B (Answer) to Declaration of of Rachael Lavi In Support Of Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #5 Exhibit C (Notice of Case Management Conference) to Declaration of of Rachael Lavi In Support Of Notice of Removal to Federal Court) (Attorney Rachael Sarah Lavi added to party Salient CRGT, Inc.a Maryland Corporation(pty:dft))(Lavi, Rachael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eric Allione v. Salient CRGT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allione Eric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Allione
Represented By: Brooke Christine Bellah
Represented By: Joseph M Lovretovich
Represented By: Nicholas W Sarris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salient CRGT, Inc.a Maryland Corporation
Represented By: Rachael Sarah Lavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salient CRGT, Inc.
Represented By: Rachael Sarah Lavi
Represented By: Carly M Nese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?