Immanuel F. Sanchez v. Manuel L. Real et al
Plaintiff: Immanuel F. Sanchez
Defendant: Kiry K. Gray, R. Smith, Illene Bernal, Manuel L. Real, Martha Torres, Christine Chung, Chris Sawyer, D.D., Alexander F. Mackinnon, DOES 1 to 10, inclusive and Estrella Tamayo
Case Number: 2:2019cv06015
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION #8 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Plaintiff has not demonstrated entitlement to relief pursuant to Local Rule 7-18. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. (lom)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DISMISSING THE CASE #7 filed by Plaintiff Immanuel F. Sanchez. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (lom)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #4 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby: DENIED (see comments above). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby: DISMISSED. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (lom)
July 15, 2019 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #4 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(dml)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error case should have been filed as a Discovery case and not as a 194 case. The case should read as follows: 2:19-CV-06015-MWF-RAOx. Case 2:19-cv-05951 MWF(AFM) is now termed. (rn)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 This case has been assigned to United States District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The case number on all documents filed with the Court should read 2:19-cv-05951 MWF (AFM). Please refer to the assigned judge's Procedures and Schedules, available on the Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov/judges-requirements, for additional information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jtil) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Immanuel F. Sanchez. (jtil)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE filed by Plaintiff Immanuel F. Sanchez. (jtil)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Immanuel F. Sanchez, (jtil)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Immanuel F. Sanchez against All Defendants. Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 CV71, #3 Summons Request 1, #4 Summons Request 2, #5 Summons Request 3, #6 Summons Request 4, #7 Summons Request 5, #8 Summons Request 6, #9 Summons Request 7, #10 Summons Request 8, #11 Summons Request 9, #12 Summons Request 10) (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Immanuel F. Sanchez v. Manuel L. Real et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiry K. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illene Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel L. Real
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander F. Mackinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estrella Tamayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immanuel F. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?