Victor Navarrete v. Kinkisharyo International, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Victor Navarrete
Defendant: Kinkisharyo International, L.L.C., DOES 1 through 20 and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv06080
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for September 30, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/23/2019. (sw)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh)
July 15, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Kinkisharyo International, L.L.C. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 7/15/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(lh)
July 15, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Victor Navarrete, upon Defendant Kinkisharyo International, L.L.C. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Person Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/14/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (lh)
July 15, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Kinkisharyo International, L.L.C., Does 1 through 20. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Victor Navarrete. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/11/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Kinkisharyo International, L.L.C.. (Holland, Ronald)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kinkisharyo International, L.L.C., identifying Kinki Sharyo Co., Ltd.. (Holland, Ronald)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV20358 Receipt No: 0973-24087255 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Kinkisharyo International, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip Shecter) (Attorney Ronald J Holland, II added to party Kinkisharyo International, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Holland, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victor Navarrete v. Kinkisharyo International, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinkisharyo International, L.L.C.
Represented By: Ronald J Holland, II
Represented By: Saniya Ahmed
Represented By: Philip Joseph Shecter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Navarrete
Represented By: Kaveh Sam Elihu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?