Brian Whitaker, v. Say s Investment, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker,
Defendant: Say s Investment, LLC, Does 1-10 and Futura Bus Net, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv06088
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 21 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 9/30/19 filed by Defendant Say s Investment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sabo, Gregory)
August 23, 2019 Filing 20 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Say s Investment, LLC answer now due 9/16/2019; Brian Whitaker, answer now due 9/16/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Say s Investment, LLC.(Attorney Gregory K Sabo added to party Say s Investment, LLC(pty:dft))(Sabo, Gregory)
August 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of address by Russell C Handy attorney for Plaintiff Brian Whitaker,. Changing attorneys address to 8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200, San Diego, CA 92111. Filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker,. (Handy, Russell)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. On August 15, 2019, the clerk entered default as to Defendant Futura Bus Net, Inc. #17 . The Order to Show Cause dated August 4, 2019 #16 is hereby discharged. Plaintiff shall move for default judgment within 30 days after a final disposition of the pending claims against all remaining defendant. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Futura Bus Net, Inc., a California Corporation. (gk)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 8/28/2019 why this action should not be dismissed as to defendant Futura Bus Net, Inc. for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this Order To Show Cause, on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: An answer by the following defendant(s): Futura Bus Net, Inc.; or, Plaintiff's application for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. This action will be dismissed as to defendant Futura Bus Net, Inc. if the above-mentioned document(s) are not filed by the date indicated above. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Futura Bus Net, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Grace, Phyl)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker,, upon Defendant Say s Investment, LLC served on 8/4/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: SAEED FAZEL-YEKTA in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker,, upon Defendant Futura Bus Net, Inc. served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker,, re Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) #11 served on 7/28/2019. (Carson, Chris)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassign Pursuant to General Order 19-03 filed on 7/17/2019. The case number will now read CV 19-6088-DMG (ASx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-06088 DMG(ASx). (rn)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Futura Bus Net, Inc., Say s Investment, LLC. (esa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker,. (Handy, Russell)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker,, (Handy, Russell)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker,. (Handy, Russell)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24088509 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker,. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker,(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker, v. Say s Investment, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Say s Investment, LLC
Represented By: Gregory K Sabo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Futura Bus Net, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker,
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?