Debra Vanderlaan v. Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Debra Vanderlaan
Defendant: Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv06154
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT (DKT. #16 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from November 25, 2019 to February 10, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall refer to the Court's Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule for motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/6/2019. (ake)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Dismiss #17 , for the following reasons:(1) Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment; (2) Pursuant to L.R. 52-4.1, a proposed order shall be e-filed as a separate attachment to any document seeking Court approval. Because this Court does not require a proposed order to be submitted with a motion, there is no further action required by counsel. Dkt. 9 at 9. (jp) Modified on 9/10/2019 (jp).
September 10, 2019 Filing 17 [STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 09/10/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #18 ] - Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #16 filed by Defendant Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC. (Vakil, Bijal). Modified on 9/10/2019 (jp).
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/25/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Vakil, Bijal)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Hallie E Kiernan counsel for Defendant Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC. Adding Hallie Kiernan as counsel of record for Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC. (Attorney Hallie E Kiernan added to party Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Kiernan, Hallie)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, identifying Walmart Inc.. (Vakil, Bijal)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC answer now due 9/9/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC.(Vakil, Bijal)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Catherine S Simonsen on behalf of Defendant Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC (Attorney Catherine S Simonsen added to party Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Simonsen, Catherine)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bijal V Vakil on behalf of Defendant Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC (Attorney Bijal V Vakil added to party Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Vakil, Bijal)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Debra Vanderlaan, upon Defendant Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp. Agent for Service by serving Gabriela Sanchez, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ardalan, Joanna)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC. (et)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Debra Vanderlaan. (Ardalan, Joanna)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Debra Vanderlaan. (Ardalan, Joanna)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Debra Vanderlaan, identifying Debra Vanderlaan, Plaintiff; Wal-Mart.com, USA, LLC, Defendant. (Ardalan, Joanna)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Debra Vanderlaan. (Ardalan, Joanna)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24099924 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Debra Vanderlaan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint) (Attorney Joanna Ardalan added to party Debra Vanderlaan(pty:pla))(Ardalan, Joanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Debra Vanderlaan v. Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Vanderlaan
Represented By: Joanna Ardalan
Represented By: John Tehranian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC
Represented By: Catherine S Simonsen
Represented By: Hallie E Kiernan
Represented By: Bijal V Vakil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?