Christine Martinez v. Andrew M. Saul
Plaintiff: Christine Martinez
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv06253
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Christine Martinez, re Order #9 served on 8/2/19. (Lowenstein, Janna)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christine Martinez, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Lowenstein, Janna)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Errata filed by Plaintiff Christine Martinez. (Lowenstein, Janna)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christine Martinez, upon Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 8/5/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Lowenstein, Janna)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Attorney Timothy R Bolin added to party Andrew M. Saul(pty:dft))(Bolin, Timothy)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (see document for details) (Attachments: #1 Blank Consent Form) (hr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (hr)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Christine Martinez. (Lowenstein, Janna)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Christine Martinez. (Lowenstein, Janna)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christine Martinez, identifying United States Social Security Administration. (Lowenstein, Janna)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christine Martinez. (Lowenstein, Janna)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Christine Martinez. (Attorney Janna K Lowenstein added to party Christine Martinez(pty:pla))(Lowenstein, Janna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christine Martinez v. Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Timothy R Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Martinez
Represented By: Janna K Lowenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?