Sara Baker v. Invacare Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Baker and Sara Baker
Defendant: Invacare Corporation and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv06297
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Defendant Invacare Corporation.. (Rofos, Efthalia)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 11:00 AM. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE filed by Defendant Invacare Corporation. Amended Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court (Rofos, Efthalia)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE filed by Defendant Invacare Corporation. Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court (Staikos, Efthalia)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
July 22, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Invacare Corporation. (Filed in state court 7/19/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 3)(esa)
July 22, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sara Baker, upon Defendant Invacare Corporation served on 6/20/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Filed in state court 6/25/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)
July 22, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Invacare Corporation, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Sara Baker. (Filed in state court 6/20/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 5) (esa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case filed by Defendant Invacare Corporation. (Staikos, Efthalia)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Invacare Corporation identifying Invacare Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Staikos, Efthalia)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Invacare Corporation, identifying Invacare Corporation. (Staikos, Efthalia)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Darcie Karol re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Invacare Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Staikos, Efthalia)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Efthalia S. Rofos re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Invacare Corporation. (Staikos, Efthalia)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Invacare Corporation. (Staikos, Efthalia)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV21483 Receipt No: 0973-24122964 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Invacare Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Attorney Efthalia C Staikos added to party Invacare Corporation(pty:dft))(Staikos, Efthalia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sara Baker v. Invacare Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Baker
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Golan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invacare Corporation
Represented By: Efthalia C Staikos
Represented By: Rachel J Lee
Represented By: John L Barber
Represented By: Efthalia S Rofos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?