Sarah George v. Nutribullet, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Sarah George
Defendant: Nutribullet, L.L.C., NUTRILIVING, L.L.C., Capital Brands, L.L.C., CALL TO ACTION, L.L.C., Homeland Housewares, L.L.C. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv06298
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: On the Courts own motion, a Status Conference/Scheduling Conference is set for September 30, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. See minute order for details. (lom)
August 16, 2019 Filing 28 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Call To Action, L.L.C., Capital Brands, L.L.C., Homeland Housewares, L.L.C., Nutribullet, L.L.C., Nutriliving, L.L.C., identifying Sarah George; Abir Cohen Tryzon Salo LLP; Capital Brands, LLC; NutriBullet, LLC; NutriLiving, LLC; Homeland Housewares LLC; Call to Action LLC; The Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Meyer, Steven)
August 16, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Call To Action, L.L.C., Capital Brands, L.L.C., Homeland Housewares, L.L.C., Nutribullet, L.L.C., Nutriliving, L.L.C..(Attorney Steven E Meyer added to party Call To Action, L.L.C. (pty:dft), Attorney Steven E Meyer added to party Capital Brands, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven E Meyer added to party Homeland Housewares, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven E Meyer added to party Nutribullet, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven E Meyer added to party Nutriliving, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Meyer, Steven)
August 2, 2019 Filing 26 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Sarah George, upon Defendant Nutriliving, L.L.C. served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Lavine, Aaron)
August 2, 2019 Filing 25 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Sarah George, upon Defendant Nutribullet, L.L.C. served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Lavine, Aaron)
August 2, 2019 Filing 24 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Sarah George, upon Defendant Homeland Housewares, L.L.C. served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Lavine, Aaron)
August 2, 2019 Filing 23 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Sarah George, upon Defendant Capital Brands, L.L.C. served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Lavine, Aaron)
August 2, 2019 Filing 22 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Sarah George, upon Defendant Call To Action, L.L.C. served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Lavine, Aaron)
July 25, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Sarah George, identifying Nutribullet L.L.C., Capital Brands L.L.C, Homeland Housewares L.L.C., Nutriliving L.L.C., Call to Action L.L.C.. (Lavine, Aaron)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:16-cv-06894 DDP(SSx). Case transferred from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm to Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-06298 DDP(SSx). Signed by Judge Dean D. Pregerson (rn)
July 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Nutriliving, L.L.C. (esa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Nutribullet, L.L.C. (esa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Homeland Housewares, L.L.C. (esa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Capital Brands, L.L.C. (esa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons ssued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Call To Action, L.L.C. (esa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Sarah George. (Lavine, Aaron)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Sarah George. (Lavine, Aaron)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Sarah George. (Lavine, Aaron)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Sarah George. (Lavine, Aaron)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Sarah George. (Lavine, Aaron)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Sarah George. Related Case(s): 2:17-cv-00828-DDP; 2:17-cv-03358-DDP; 2:17-cv-09161-DDP; 2:18-cv-02336-DDP; 2:18-cv-03025-DDP; 2:18-cv-03046-DDP; 2:18-cv-03858-DDP; 2:18-cv-03941-DDP; 2:18-cv-04800-DDP; 2:18-cv-05413 DDP; 2:18-cv-06126-DDP; 2:18-cv-05829-DDP; 2:18-cv-08613-DDP; 2:18-cv-08720-DDP; 2:18-CV-08771-DDP; 2:18-cv-08778-DDP; 2:18-cv-10194-DDP; 2:19-cv-00305-DDP; 2:19-cv-00359-DDP; 2:19-cv-00376-DDP; 2:19-cv-00402-DDP; 2:19-cv-00424-DDP; 2:19-cv-00447-DDP; 2:19-cv-00917-DDP; 2:19-cv-02356-DDP; 2:19-cv-02543-DDP; 2:19-cv-02546-DDP, 2:19-cv-02555-DDP, 2:19-cv-02572-DDP; 2:19-cv-02601-DDP; 2:19-cv-02613-DDP; 2:19-cv-02619-DDP; 2:19-cv-2696-DDP; 2:19-cv-03384; 2:19-cv-03385, 2:19-cv-03388, 2:19-cv-03399, 2:19-cv-03421,2:19-cv-04320, 2:19-cv-04709-DDP, 2:19-cv-06230, 2:19-cv-06232 (Lavine, Aaron)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aaron Lavine counsel for Plaintiff Sarah George. Adding Douglas Rochen as counsel of record for Sarah George for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Sarah George. (Lavine, Aaron)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aaron Lavine counsel for Plaintiff Sarah George. Adding Boris Treyzon as counsel of record for Sarah George for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Sarah George. (Lavine, Aaron)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aaron Lavine counsel for Plaintiff Sarah George. Adding Aaron Lavine as counsel of record for Sarah George for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Sarah George. (Lavine, Aaron)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sarah George. (Lavine, Aaron)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24123250 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Sarah George. (Attorney Aaron Lavine added to party Sarah George(pty:pla))(Lavine, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarah George v. Nutribullet, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutribullet, L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark K Suzumoto
Represented By: Steven E Meyer
Represented By: Jeffrey Bruce Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NUTRILIVING, L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark K Suzumoto
Represented By: Steven E Meyer
Represented By: Jeffrey Bruce Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Brands, L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark K Suzumoto
Represented By: Steven E Meyer
Represented By: Jeffrey Bruce Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALL TO ACTION, L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark K Suzumoto
Represented By: Steven E Meyer
Represented By: Jeffrey Bruce Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeland Housewares, L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark K Suzumoto
Represented By: Steven E Meyer
Represented By: Jeffrey Bruce Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah George
Represented By: Aaron Lavine
Represented By: Boris Treyzon
Represented By: Douglas A Rochen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?