Lauri Manhas v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Lauri Manhas
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv06368
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from District of Arizona, 2:19-cv-04906 filed 8/7/2019. (iv)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO TRANSFER THE ACTION TO THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA #8 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS ORDERED that Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's Motion to Transfer #6 theAction to the District of Arizona is granted. Case transferred to the District of Arizona. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (lom)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to District of Arizona filed by Plaintiff Lauri Manhas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Michaels, Jonathan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.. (Rogers, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Arizona filed by defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick Huth, #2 Declaration of Matthew R. Rogers, #3 Exhibit A. to Declaration of Matthew R. Rogers, #4 Proposed Order) (Rogers, Matthew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, identifying Daimler AG. (Rogers, Matthew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Rogers, Matthew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV20692 Receipt No: 0973-24134698 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Remainder of State Court File) (Attorney Matthew R Rogers added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Rogers, Matthew)
July 23, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, filed by plaintiff Lauri Manhas. (Filed in state court 5/13/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lauri Manhas v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauri Manhas
Represented By: Kyle Norman Gurwell
Represented By: Jonathan A Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: Matthew R Rogers
Represented By: Emma E Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?