Anthony Sanders et al v. County of Ventura
Plaintiff: Anthony Sanders, Shawn Holzberger, Justin Doering, Robert Coughlin and Virginia Tinoco
Defendant: County of Ventura
Case Number: 2:2019cv06370
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Timothy Lanquist for Consent to be Included as Individual Plaintiff filed by Plaintiffs Robert Coughlin, Justin Doering, Shawn Holzberger, Anthony Sanders, Virginia Tinoco (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ryan Lindsey, #2 Affidavit of Andrew Littlefield, #3 Affidavit of John Lopez, #4 Affidavit of Mario Luna, #5 Affidavit of Loren Machado, #6 Affidavit of Leon Mah, #7 Affidavit of Steven Mayo, #8 Affidavit of James McGuire, #9 Affidavit of John Meeker, #10 Affidavit of Isaiah Miramontes, #11 Affidavit of Travis Neet, #12 Affidavit of Juan Olmos, #13 Affidavit of Jason Pallotto, #14 Affidavit of Mark Plassmeyer, #15 Affidavit of Kyle Robinson, #16 Affidavit of David Rodriguez, #17 Affidavit of Javier Rodriguez, #18 Affidavit of Frances Saleh, #19 Affidavit of Peter Seery, #20 Affidavit of Jose Torres, #21 Affidavit of Kathryn Torres, #22 Affidavit of Jeff Valentine, #23 Affidavit of Jacob Valenzuela, #24 Affidavit of Luis Vazquez, #25 Affidavit of Nicole Vriondes, #26 Affidavit of Adam Wittkins, #27 Affidavit of Matthew Young, #28 Affidavit of Michael Young)(Mastagni, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Michael Aguilar for Consent to be Included as Individual Plaintiff filed by Plaintiffs Robert Coughlin, Justin Doering, Shawn Holzberger, Anthony Sanders, Virginia Tinoco (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dillan Alvarez, #2 Affidavit of Andres Trujillo, #3 Affidavit of Wendy Aulino, #4 Affidavit of Blake Barnes, #5 Affidavit of Jeff Barry, #6 Affidavit of Kristina Bertilson, #7 Affidavit of Chris Brackpool, #8 Affidavit of David Brantley, #9 Affidavit of Greg Cadman, #10 Affidavit of Jason Cantrall, #11 Affidavit of Marie Cantrall, #12 Affidavit of Guillermo Cazares, #13 Affidavit of Tony Chiaramonte, #14 Affidavit of Gerardo Cruz, #15 Affidavit of Joey De Los Reyes, #16 Affidavit of Samuel Dominguez, #17 Affidavit of Victor Flores, #18 Affidavit of Chris Foley, #19 Affidavit of Camille Fuchs, #20 Affidavit of Gregory Guilin, #21 Affidavit of John Hajducko, #22 Affidavit of James Hildreth, #23 Affidavit of Jacob Holt, #24 Affidavit of Daniel Horan, #25 Affidavit of Frank Huber, #26 Affidavit of K'Lynn Jackson, #27 Affidavit of Daniel James, #28 Affidavit of Larrs Johnson, #29 Affidavit of David Kadosono)(Mastagni, David)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Victor Medina for Consent to be Included as Individual Plaintiff filed by Plaintiffs Robert Coughlin, Justin Doering, Shawn Holzberger, Anthony Sanders, Virginia Tinoco (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ryan Milbourn, #2 Affidavit of Jeffrey Miller, #3 Affidavit of Kelli Moseley, #4 Affidavit of Kacey Pope, #5 Affidavit of Tim Prickett, #6 Affidavit of Adrian Ramirez, #7 Affidavit of Paul Richards, #8 Affidavit of Roxanna Rodriguez, #9 Affidavit of Christine Romney, #10 Affidavit of Pasha Sabet, #11 Affidavit of Dennis Silva, #12 Affidavit of Jeffrey Smestad, #13 Affidavit of Timothy Urton, #14 Affidavit of Jackie Wells, #15 Affidavit of Samir Zuhric)(Mastagni, David)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Glenn Axelrod for Consent to be Included as Individual Plaintiff filed by Plaintiffs Robert Coughlin, Justin Doering, Shawn Holzberger, Anthony Sanders, Virginia Tinoco (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Daniel Blanck, #2 Affidavit of Abraham Bueno, #3 Affidavit of Bradford Clifton, #4 Affidavit of Nieves Colorado, #5 Affidavit of Timothy Delgado, #6 Affidavit of Michael Dixon, #7 Affidavit of Steven Donlon, #8 Affidavit of Scott Duffner, #9 Affidavit of Daniel Esters, #10 Affidavit of John Fox, #11 Affidavit of Shawn Green, #12 Affidavit of Alan Hartkop, #13 Affidavit of William Hollowell, #14 Affidavit of Anthony Israel, #15 Affidavit of Leonard Lopez, #16 Affidavit of Christopher MacIntyre, #17 Affidavit of Crystal Marin)(Mastagni, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Timothy Ragan for Consent to be Included as Individual Plaintiff filed by Plaintiffs Robert Coughlin, Justin Doering, Shawn Holzberger, Anthony Sanders, Virginia Tinoco (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Erica Ragsdale, #2 Affidavit of Joseph Anthony Ramirez, Jr., #3 Affidavit of Jaime Reyes, #4 Affidavit of Vince Reynoso, #5 Affidavit of Darin Rich, #6 Affidavit of Luke Riordan, #7 Affidavit of Paul Rodriguez, #8 Affidavit of Teresa Rush, #9 Affidavit of David Schwieder, #10 Affidavit of James Segovia, #11 Affidavit of John Steele, #12 Affidavit of John Stubblefield, #13 Affidavit of Jeffrey Stuteville, #14 Affidavit of Eric Taylor, #15 Affidavit of James Tedder, #16 Affidavit of Jeffrey Therault, #17 Affidavit of Dan Turock, #18 Affidavit of Anthony Tutino, #19 Affidavit of Dan Vanover, #20 Affidavit of Amber Voorhees, #21 Affidavit of Don White, #22 Affidavit of Brian Zamore)(Mastagni, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Nicole Adrianzen for Consent to be Included as Individual Plaintiff filed by Plaintiffs Robert Coughlin, Justin Doering, Shawn Holzberger, Anthony Sanders, Virginia Tinoco (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jonathan Beeson, #2 Affidavit of Bradley Bordon, #3 Affidavit of Steve Buckley, #4 Affidavit of Allen Burckhard, #5 Affidavit of Lee Chapman, #6 Affidavit of Travis Clemens, #7 Affidavit of Rick Cochrane, #8 Affidavit of Thomas Couture, #9 Affidavit of Kristopher Doepking, #10 Affidavit of Tyler Ebell, #11 Affidavit of James Espinoza, #12 Affidavit of Paul Ferruzza, #13 Affidavit of Alexander Keller, #14 Affidavit of Amy Kunde, #15 Affidavit of Kenneth Ledesma, #16 Affidavit of David Lopez, #17 Affidavit of Dashan Mano, #18 Affidavit of Jason Miller, #19 Affidavit of Kenneth Mitchell, #20 Affidavit of Jonathan Morales, #21 Affidavit of Jack Parrish, #22 Affidavit of Shelby Paz Barrios)(Mastagni, David)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant County of Ventura. (lh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Robert Coughlin, Justin Doering, Shawn Holzberger, Anthony Sanders, Virginia Tinoco. (Mastagni, David)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Robert Coughlin, Justin Doering, Shawn Holzberger, Anthony Sanders, Virginia Tinoco, (Mastagni, David)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Robert Coughlin, Justin Doering, Shawn Holzberger, Anthony Sanders, Virginia Tinoco. (Mastagni, David)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24135007 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Anthony Sanders, Robert Coughlin, Justin Doering, Shawn Holzberger, Virginia Tinoco. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anthony Sanders to be Included as Individual Plaintiff, #2 Affidavit of Shawn Holzberger to be Included as Individual Plaintiff, #3 Affidavit of Justin Doering to be Included as Individual Plaintiff, #4 Affidavit of Robert Coughlin to be Included as Individual Plaintiff, #5 Affidavit of Virginia Tinoco to be Included as Individual Plaintiff) (Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Robert Coughlin(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Justin Doering(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Shawn Holzberger(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Anthony Sanders(pty:pla), Attorney David Emilio Mastagni added to party Virginia Tinoco(pty:pla))(Mastagni, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Sanders et al v. County of Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Sanders
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Holzberger
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Doering
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Coughlin
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Tinoco
Represented By: David Emilio Mastagni
Represented By: Ian Barclay Sangster
Represented By: Isaac Sean Stevens
Represented By: Tashayla Danielle Devaney-Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?