Leo Washington et al v. United States et al
Plaintiff: Leandrea O'Neal and Leo Washington
Defendant: Erica Babaloa, PNP, St John's Well Child and Fanily Center Inc., Martin Luther King Jr. - Los Angeles (MLK-LA) Healthcare Corporation, Cary Gallardo, MD, DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive,, Greg Marconi, MD, Children's Hospital Los Angeles, a California Non-Profit Corporation, Dr. Cary Gallardo, United States, Dr. Greg Marconi, Erica Babalola, Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Childrens Hospital Los Angeles and Martin Luther King, Jr. Community Hospital
Case Number: 2:2019cv06425
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Defendant Greg Marconi. (Martino, Alexandra)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court filed by Defendant Greg Marconi. Motion set for hearing on 10/21/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Alexandra Concetta Martino added to party Greg Marconi(pty:dft)) (Martino, Alexandra)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United States, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #8 , Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #15 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Order,, Add and Terminate Parties, #10 served on August 26, 2019. (Gamble, Gwendolyn)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) GRANTING DEFENDANT UNITED STATES' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 13) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Accordingly, the Court deems Plaintiffs' failure to file an opposition as consent to the granting of Defendant's Motion. The Court therefore GRANTS the Motion and DISMISSES the complaint as to Defendant United States without prejudice. (see document for further details) (bm)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS: DECLARATION OF GWENDOLYN M. GAMBLE filed by Defendant United States. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 POS)(Gamble, Gwendolyn)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities: Declarations of Meredith Torres and Gwendolyn M. Gamble #12 filed by Defendant United States. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 POS) (Gamble, Gwendolyn)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities: Declarations of Meredith Torres and Gwendolyn M. Gamble filed by Defendant United States. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 POS) (Gamble, Gwendolyn)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 APPENDIX filed by Defendant United States. Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Document Sealed,,,, #9 Redacted (Gamble, Gwendolyn)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CORRECTING CAPTION #4 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Notice of Substitution #4 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The names St. John's Well Child and Family Center, Inc. and Erica Babalola, PNP shall be deleted from the caption of this case; 2. The United States shall be inserted in the caption in place and instead of St. John's Well Child and Family Center, Inc. and Erica Babalola, PNP; 3. The Caption shall be changed as follows: (see document for further details) (bm)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SEALING DEFENDANTS' APPENDIX (DOC. NO. 3-1) AND ORDERING DEFENDANT UNITED STATES TO FILE A REDACTED COPY FOR THE OPEN RECORD by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: On July 24, 2019, the United States filed on the open record Plaintiffs' state court Complaint and other state court documents that include the full name of a minor throughout the documents. (Doc. No. 3-1). Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a) dictates that in any filing that contains "the name of an individual known to be a minor... the party or nonparty making the filing may include only... the minor's initials." Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(a)(3). Additionally, Local Rule 5.2-1 indicates that "[i]t is the responsibility of the filer to ensure full compliance with the redaction requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2."The Court hereby SEALS the United States' Appendix (Doc. No. 3-1) and ORDERS the United States to file a redacted version of the document for the open record, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a)(3) and Local Rule 5.2-1. (bm)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 1:30 PM. (REFER TO DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (vv)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (vv)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION filed by Defendant United States. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 POS)(Gamble, Gwendolyn)
July 24, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Leandrea O'Neal, Leo Washington, upon Defendant Cary Gallardo served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe 45 Yrs, Female, Hispanic, 150 Lbs, 5'6 Blonde - Person Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 2/22/2019 Submitted as attachment 1 to Doc. 3 Appendix (car)
July 24, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Greg Marconi. Filed in State Court on 2/22/19 Submitted as attachment 1 to Doc. 3 Appendix(car)
July 24, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Leandrea O'Neal, Leo Washington, upon Defendant Childrens Hospital Los Angeles served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Maria Angulo person authorized to accept service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 1/30/19 Submitted as attachment 1 to Doc. 3 Appendix (car)
July 24, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Martin Luther King, Jr. Community Hospital. Filed in State Court on 1/24/2019 Submitted with Doc. 3 Appendix (car)
July 24, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Erica Babalola, Childrens Hospital Los Angeles, Does 1-100 inclusive, Cary Gallardo, Greg Marconi, Martin Luther King, Jr.-Los Angeles MLK-LA Healthcare Corporation, St Johns Well Child and Family Center Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Leandrea O'Neal, Leo Washington. Filed in State Court on 12/31/18 Submitted as attachment 1 to Doc. 3 Appendix (car) Modified on 7/25/2019 (car).
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Erica Babaloa, PNP, St John's Well Child and Fanily Center Inc.. (Gamble, Gwendolyn)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court County of Los Angeles, case number 18STCV10192 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendants Erica Babaloa, PNP, St John's Well Child and Fanily Center Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 POS) (Attorney Gwendolyn Millicent Gamble added to party Erica Babaloa, PNP(pty:dft), Attorney Gwendolyn Millicent Gamble added to party St John's Well Child and Fanily Center Inc.(pty:dft))(Gamble, Gwendolyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leo Washington et al v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Babaloa, PNP
Represented By: Gwendolyn Millicent Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St John's Well Child and Fanily Center Inc.
Represented By: Gwendolyn Millicent Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Luther King Jr. - Los Angeles (MLK-LA) Healthcare Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cary Gallardo, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Marconi, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Children's Hospital Los Angeles, a California Non-Profit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Cary Gallardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Gwendolyn Millicent Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Greg Marconi
Represented By: Alexandra Concetta Martino
Represented By: Erica A Levitt
Represented By: Robert L McKenna, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Babalola
Represented By: Gwendolyn Millicent Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Childrens Hospital Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Luther King, Jr. Community Hospital
Represented By: Scott Rory Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leandrea O'Neal
Represented By: Randy H McMurray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Washington
Represented By: Randy H McMurray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?