Miner, Ltd. v. Brock William Livesey et al
Plaintiff: MINER, LTD.
Defendant: Matthew PeGan, Brock William Livesey, John Barclay Chamberland and Coastal Doors
Case Number: 2:2019cv06426
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #23 , Notice of Interested Parties #24 , Disclosure #25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Case number reads CV 19-6426-CAS-SK, but should read CV 19-06426-FMO-SK. See Order reassigning (Dkt. 13). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (cw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE of Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Coastal Doors (Brazil, Leonard)
September 13, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Coastal Doors has no parent corporation or publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock. (Brazil, Leonard)
September 13, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants John Barclay Chamberland, Coastal Doors, Brock William Livesey, Matthew PeGan.(Brazil, Leonard)
August 23, 2019 Filing 22 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendants Brock William Livesey, Coastal Doors, Matthew PeGan, John Barclay Chamberland.(Attorney Leonard Brazil added to party John Barclay Chamberland(pty:dft), Attorney Leonard Brazil added to party Coastal Doors(pty:dft), Attorney Leonard Brazil added to party Brock William Livesey (pty:dft), Attorney Leonard Brazil added to party Matthew PeGan (pty:dft))(Brazil, Leonard)
August 12, 2019 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Miner, Ltd., re Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89), #13 , Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #15 , Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #16 , and Judge Fernando M. Olguins Initial Standing Order Dated December 2017 served on 8/7/2019. (Markel, Asa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Miner, Ltd., upon Defendant Coastal Doors served on 8/3/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brock William Livesey, CEO/CFO of Coastal Doors in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. Served by first class mail on 8/5/2019 (Markel, Asa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Miner, Ltd., upon Defendant Brock William Livesey served on 8/3/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brock William Livesey, an individual in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. Served by first class mail on 8/5/2019 (Markel, Asa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Miner, Ltd., upon Defendant Matthew PeGan served on 8/3/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Matthew PeGan, an individual in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Markel, Asa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Miner, Ltd., upon Defendant John Barclay Chamberland served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Barclay Chamberland, an individual in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Markel, Asa)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #12 Non-Resident Attorney Jiwon J. Yhee APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Miner, LTD., designating Asa W. Markel as local counsel. (lt)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE GRANTING by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #11 Non-Resident Attorney David J. Stein APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Miner, LTD., designating Asa W. Markel as local counsel. (lt)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-06426 FMO(SKx). (rn)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jiwon J. Yhee to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Miner, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24171675) filed by plaintiff Miner, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Proposed Order) (Markel, Asa)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David J. Stein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Miner, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24171595) filed by plaintiff Miner, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Markel, Asa)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants John Barclay Chamberland, Coastal Doors, Brock William Livesey, Matthew PeGan. (car)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jiwon J Yhee. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David J Stein. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff MINER, LTD. identifying OnPoint Group, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Markel, Asa)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MINER, LTD., (Markel, Asa)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff MINER, LTD.. (Markel, Asa)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MINER, LTD.. (Markel, Asa)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24142926 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff MINER, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7) (Attorney Asa William Markel added to party MINER, LTD.(pty:pla))(Markel, Asa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miner, Ltd. v. Brock William Livesey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew PeGan
Represented By: Leonard Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock William Livesey
Represented By: Leonard Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Barclay Chamberland
Represented By: Leonard Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Doors
Represented By: Leonard Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINER, LTD.
Represented By: Asa William Markel
Represented By: Jiwon J Yhee
Represented By: David J Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?