Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Financial Credit Investment III SPV-B (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III Trust B, Financial Credit Investment II Trust A, Financial Credit Investment III SPV-A (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment II Trust C, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Financial Credit Investment III Trust A, Financial Credit Investment II Trust D, Financial Credit Investment II Limited, Wilmington Trust, National Association and Financial Credit Investment II Trust WT
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv06478
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Christina A Snyder
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #23 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: 1. Plaintiffs are granted until October 2, 2019 to file a First Amended Complaint if they elect to do so; 2. If Plaintiffs do not file a First Amended Complaint on or before October 2, 2019, Defendants deadline to respond to the Complaint shall be October 16, 2019; 3. If Plaintiffs file a First Amended Complaint on or before October 2, 2019, Defendants deadline to respond shall be October 23, 2019; and 4. If Defendant files a motion in response to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint on or before October 23, 2019, the briefing schedule in relation to that motion shall be as follows: (i) Plaintiffs opposition will be due November 27, 2019; and (ii) Defendants reply in support of its motion will be due December 20, 2019. (lc)
September 16, 2019 Filing 23 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File re Filing of First Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Financial Credit Investment II Limited, Financial Credit Investment II Trust A, Financial Credit Investment II Trust C, Financial Credit Investment II Trust D, Financial Credit Investment II Trust WT, Financial Credit Investment III SPV-A (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III SPV-B (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III Trust A, Financial Credit Investment III Trust B, U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LeQuang, Khai)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jarrett Earl Ganer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company #18 designating Vivian L Orlando as local counsel by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hutson Brit Smelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company and designating Vivian L Orlando as local counsel #17 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Erin Elizabeth Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company and designating Vivian L Orlando as local counsel #16 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas F.A. Hetherington to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company and designating Vivian L Orlando as local counsel #15 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc)
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jarrett Earl Ganer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24394789) filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Orlando, Vivian)
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hutson Brit Smelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24394751) filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Orlando, Vivian)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Erin Elizabeth Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24394704) filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Orlando, Vivian)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas F.A. Hetherington to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24394651) filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Orlando, Vivian)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Transamerica Life Insurance Company answer now due 9/18/2019, filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company.(Attorney Vivian I Orlando added to party Transamerica Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Orlando, Vivian)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Financial Credit Investment II Trust C, Financial Credit Investment III Trust B, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Financial Credit Investment II Trust D, Financial Credit Investment II Limited, U.S. Bank National Association, Financial Credit Investment III SPV-A (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment II Trust WT, Wilmington Trust, National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Financial Credit Investment III SPV-B (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III Trust A, Financial Credit Investment II Trust A, upon Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for service by serving Carlos Paz, Intake Specialist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cousineau, Michelle)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven M. Pesner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Financial Credit Investment II Limited, Financial Credit Investment II Trust A, Financial Credit Investment II Trust C, Financial Credit Investment II Trust D, Financial Credit Investment II Trust WT, Financial Credit Investment III SPV-A (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III SPV-B (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III Trust A, Financial Credit Investment III Trust B, U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Trust, National Association and designating Khai LeQuang as local counsel #6 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-03238 CAS(GJSx). Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-06478 CAS(GJSx). Signed by Judge Christina A. Snyder (rn)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (esa)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michelle O'Meara Cousineau counsel for Plaintiffs Financial Credit Investment II Limited, Financial Credit Investment II Trust A, Financial Credit Investment II Trust C, Financial Credit Investment II Trust D, Financial Credit Investment II Trust WT, Financial Credit Investment III SPV-A (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III SPV-B (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III Trust A, Financial Credit Investment III Trust B, U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Trust, National Association. Adding Michelle O'Meara Cousineau as counsel of record for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association; Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB; Wilmington Trust, National Association; Financial Credit Investment II Trust A; Financial Credit Investment II Trust C; Financial Credit Investment II Trust D; Financial Credit Investment II Trust WT; Financial Credit Investment II Limited; Financial Credit Investment III Trust A; Financial Credit Investment III Trust B; Financial Credit Investment III SPV-A (Cayman), L.P.; and Financial Credit Investment III SPV-B (Cayman), L.P. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Financial Credit Investment II Limited Financial Credit Investment II Trust A Financial Credit Investment II Trust C Financial Credit Investment II Trust D Financial Credit Investment II Trust WT Financial Credit Investment III SPV-A (Cayman), L.P. Financial Credit Investment III SPV-B (Cayman), L.P. Financial Credit Investment III Trust A Financial Credit Investment III Trust B U.S. Bank National Association Wells Fargo Bank, National Association Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Attorney Michelle O'Meara Cousineau added to party Financial Credit Investment II Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle O'Meara Cousineau added to party Financial Credit Investment II Trust A(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle O'Meara Cousineau added to party Financial Credit Investment II Trust C(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle O'Meara Cousineau added to party Financial Credit Investment II Trust D(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle O'Meara Cousineau added to party Financial Credit Investment II Trust WT(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle O'Meara Cousineau added to party Financial Credit Investment III SPV-A (Cayman), L.P.(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle O'Meara Cousineau added to party Financial Credit Investment III SPV-B (Cayman), L.P.(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle O'Meara Cousineau added to party Financial Credit Investment III Trust A(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle O'Meara Cousineau added to party Financial Credit Investment III Trust B(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle O'Meara Cousineau added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle O'Meara Cousineau added to party Wells Fargo Bank, National Association(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle O'Meara Cousineau added to party Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle O'Meara Cousineau added to party Wilmington Trust, National Association(pty:pla))(Cousineau, Michelle)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven M. Pesner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Financial Credit Investment II Limited, Financial Credit Investment II Trust A, Financial Credit Investment II Trust C, Financial Credit Investment II Trust D, Financial Credit Investment II Trust WT, Financial Credit Investment III SPV-A (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III SPV-B (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III Trust A, Financial Credit Investment III Trust B, U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Trust, National Association (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24151537) filed by plaintiff Financial Credit Investment II Limited, Financial Credit Investment II Trust A, Financial Credit Investment II Trust C, Financial Credit Investment II Trust D, Financial Credit Investment II Trust WT, Financial Credit Investment III SPV-A (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III SPV-B (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III Trust A, Financial Credit Investment III Trust B, U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (LeQuang, Khai)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Financial Credit Investment II Limited, Financial Credit Investment II Trust A, Financial Credit Investment II Trust C, Financial Credit Investment II Trust D, Financial Credit Investment II Trust WT, Financial Credit Investment III SPV-A (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III SPV-B (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III Trust A, Financial Credit Investment III Trust B, U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Trust, National Association. Related Case(s): EFG Bank, AG, Cayman Branch, et. al. v. Transamerica Life Insurance Co., Case No. 2:16-cv-08104-DSF-GJS, The Wolf 2005 LLC v. Transamerica Life Insurance Co., Case No. 2:17- cv-00994-CAS-GJS, LSH Co., et. al. v. Transamerica Life Insurance Co., Case No. 2:18-cv- 09711, Brighton Trustees, LLC, et al. v. Transamerica Life Insurance Co., Case No. 2:19-cv-04210 (LeQuang, Khai)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Financial Credit Investment II Limited, Financial Credit Investment II Trust A, Financial Credit Investment II Trust C, Financial Credit Investment II Trust D, Financial Credit Investment II Trust WT, Financial Credit Investment III SPV-A (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III SPV-B (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III Trust A, Financial Credit Investment III Trust B, U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Trust, National Association, identifying (Well Fargo Bank, National Association, U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bancorp, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Trust, National Association, Financial Credit Investment II Trust A, Financial Credit Investment II Trust C, Financial Credit Investment II Trust D, Financial Credit Investment II Trust WT, Financial Credit Investment II Limited, Financial Credit Investment III Trust A, Financial Credit Investment III Trust B, Financial Credit Investment III SPV- A (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III SPV- B (Cayman), L.P., and Transamerica Life Insurance Company). (LeQuang, Khai)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,, #1 filed by plaintiff Financial Credit Investment II Limited, Financial Credit Investment II Trust A, Financial Credit Investment II Trust C, Financial Credit Investment II Trust D, Financial Credit Investment II Trust WT, Financial Credit Investment III SPV-A (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III SPV-B (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III Trust A, Financial Credit Investment III Trust B, U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Trust, National Association. (LeQuang, Khai)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Financial Credit Investment II Limited, Financial Credit Investment II Trust A, Financial Credit Investment II Trust C, Financial Credit Investment II Trust D, Financial Credit Investment II Trust WT, Financial Credit Investment III SPV-A (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III SPV-B (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III Trust A, Financial Credit Investment III Trust B, U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Wilmington Trust, National Association. (LeQuang, Khai)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24151435 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Financial Credit Investment II Trust C, Financial Credit Investment III Trust B, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Financial Credit Investment II Trust D, Financial Credit Investment II Limited, U.S. Bank National Association, Financial Credit Investment III SPV-A (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment II Trust WT, Wilmington Trust, National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Financial Credit Investment III SPV-B (Cayman), L.P., Financial Credit Investment III Trust A, Financial Credit Investment II Trust A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - J to Complaint) (Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party Financial Credit Investment II Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party Financial Credit Investment II Trust A(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party Financial Credit Investment II Trust C(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party Financial Credit Investment II Trust D(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party Financial Credit Investment II Trust WT(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party Financial Credit Investment III SPV-A (Cayman), L.P.(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party Financial Credit Investment III SPV-B (Cayman), L.P.(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party Financial Credit Investment III Trust A(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party Financial Credit Investment III Trust B(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party Wells Fargo Bank, National Association(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB(pty:pla), Attorney Khai LeQuang added to party Wilmington Trust, National Association(pty:pla))(LeQuang, Khai)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Michelle O'Meara Cousineau
Represented By: Navdeep Kumar Singh
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Represented By: Steven M Pesner
Represented By: Faisal M Zubairi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Michelle O'Meara Cousineau
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Represented By: Steven M Pesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Credit Investment III SPV-B (Cayman), L.P.
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Michelle O'Meara Cousineau
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Represented By: Steven M Pesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Credit Investment III Trust B
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Michelle O'Meara Cousineau
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Represented By: Steven M Pesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Credit Investment II Trust A
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Michelle O'Meara Cousineau
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Represented By: Steven M Pesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Credit Investment III SPV-A (Cayman), L.P.
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Michelle O'Meara Cousineau
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Represented By: Steven M Pesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Credit Investment II Trust C
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Michelle O'Meara Cousineau
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Represented By: Steven M Pesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Michelle O'Meara Cousineau
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Represented By: Steven M Pesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Credit Investment III Trust A
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Michelle O'Meara Cousineau
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Represented By: Steven M Pesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Credit Investment II Trust D
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Michelle O'Meara Cousineau
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Represented By: Steven M Pesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Credit Investment II Limited
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Michelle O'Meara Cousineau
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Represented By: Steven M Pesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, National Association
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Michelle O'Meara Cousineau
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Represented By: Steven M Pesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Credit Investment II Trust WT
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Represented By: Michelle O'Meara Cousineau
Represented By: Richard W Krebs
Represented By: Steven M Pesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Hutson B Smelley
Represented By: Erin E Bennett
Represented By: Jarrett E Ganer
Represented By: Thomas F A Hetherington
Represented By: Vivian I Orlando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?