Morgan Grobe v. Emerson Electric Co. et al
Plaintiff: Morgan Grobe
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50 inclusive, Emerson Electric Co. and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv06523
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Continue #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted to Chambers. A Word or Wordperfect version of a properly formatted proposed order should be emailed to the chambers generic email address. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Continue Pre-Discovery Disclosure from September 12, 2019 to September 23, 2019 filed by plaintiff Morgan Grobe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hall, Timothy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Acceptance of Offer of Judgment filed by defendant Emerson Electric Co.. to Notice of Offer of Judgment #12 . (Case, Thomas)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Offer of Judgment filed by defendant Emerson Electric Co.. and Request for Entry of Judgment (Case, Thomas)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 12 days, filed by Defendant Emerson Electric Co... (Case, Thomas)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on September 24, 2019. (gga)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Emerson Electric Co., of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court served on July 29, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment - Notice to Adverse Party of Removal of Action to Federal Court)(Case, Thomas)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Emerson Electric Co., of (1) Notice of Assignment to United States Judges, and (2) Order to Reassign Case Due to Self-Recusal Pursuant to General Order 19-03 served on 7/30/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment - Notice of Assignment to United States Judges, #2 Exhibit Attachment - Order to Reassign Case Due to Self-Recusal Pursuant to General Order 19-03)(Case, Thomas)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-06523 CJC(JCx). (rn)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
July 26, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Emerson Electric Co. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/22/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 11 PAGE 57)(ghap)
July 26, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50 inclusive, Emerson Electric Co. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Morgan Grobe. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/27/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1 PAGE 4) (ghap)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by defendant Emerson Electric Co... (Case, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Emerson Electric Co., identifying Emerson Electric Co., a Missouri Corporation (Defendant); Preston Kelly, Inc. (non-party) (Limited Agent of Defendant); Morgan Grobe (Plaintiff); 90210 Agency, Inc. (non-party) (Agent of Plaintiff). (Case, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Emerson Electric Co.. (Case, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California, case number 19STCV22869 Receipt No: 0973-24158555 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Emerson Electric Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Thomas H Case in Support of Notice of Removal of Action Under 28 USC 1441b Diversity, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint for Damages filed in State of California County of Los Angeles Court, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Service of Process in State of California County of Los Angeles Court, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Summons to Emerson in State of California County of Los Angeles Court, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Missouri Secretary of State website printout showing Emerson in good standing, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - June 4 2019 Settlement letter to defendant, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - June 20 2019 Settlement letter to defendant, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by plaintiff in State of California County of Los Angeles Court, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Notice of Case Assignment filed by state court in State of California County of Los Angeles Court, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Notice of Confirmation of Electronic Filing on June 27 2019 in State of California County of Los Angeles Court, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Notice of Case Management Conference filed by Court in State of California County of Los Angeles Court, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Answer of Defendant Emerson Electric Co to Plaintiffs Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial filed in State of California County of Los Angeles Court, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Plaintiffs Notice of Case Management Conference in State of California County of Los Angeles Court, #14 Affidavit Proof of Service of Declaration of Thomas H. Case) (Attorney Thomas H Case added to party Emerson Electric Co.(pty:dft))(Case, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan Grobe v. Emerson Electric Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson Electric Co.
Represented By: Thomas H Case
Represented By: Michael G King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Grobe
Represented By: Timothy A Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?