Brian Cressler v. On Habeas Corpus
Petitioner: Brian Cressler
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Case Number: 2:2019cv06553
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent is granted to and including October 14, 2019, in which to file and serve a Motion to Dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, and to and including October 29, 2019, in which to file and serve an Answer to the Petition. re #23 (sbou) Modified on 9/19/2019 (sbou).
September 10, 2019 Filing 23 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File Motion to Dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus/Answer to the Petition ; Declaration of Susan S. Kim filed by Respondent On Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kim, Susan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of California Attorney General Office Susan S. Kim on behalf of Respondent On Habeas Corpus. California Attorney General Julie Anne Hokans terminated. (Attorney Susan S Kim added to party On Habeas Corpus(pty:res))(Kim, Susan)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (nbo)
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
July 29, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-38) (ghap)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Transferring Case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 07/28/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
July 29, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #18 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Brian Cressler. (Flores, E) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENT(S) ELECTRONICALLY by On Habeas Corpus: in Support of Application to Transfer Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to the Central District. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Document 1, #2 Lodged Document 2, #3 Lodged Document 3)(Hokans, Julie) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Transfer of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to the Central District by On Habeas Corpus. (Hokans, Julie). [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING Respondent's #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/26/2019. (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING NUNC PRO TUNC #6 Motion for Extension to File Petition, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/26/2019. (Martin-Gill, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
June 27, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order on Motion for Extension served on Brian Cressler. (Martin-Gill, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
June 27, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Order on Motion for Extension served on Brian Cressler. (Martin-Gill, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to file response to the petition for writ of habeas corpus by On Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Service)(Hokans, Julie) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00364-LJO-JLT. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
June 5, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 12 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Brian Cressler. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by On Habeas Corpus. Attorney Hokans, Julie Anne added. (Hokans, Julie) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #7 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzen. (Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONDENT'S ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/1/2019. (Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/1/2019. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
May 1, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Brian Cressler. (Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS by Brian Cressler.(Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to File Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Brian Cressler. (Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Brian Cressler. (Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Provide Petitioner With Blank Forms for Filing 2241 Habeas Action; ORDER DIRECTING Petitioner to File Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/22/19. Thirty Day Deadline. (Attachments: #1 2241 Instructions & Petition)(Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 22, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, served on Brian Cressler. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AUTHORIZING In Forma Pauperis Status, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/21/19. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 21, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Brian Cressler. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 20, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Brian Cressler. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 2254 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against On Habeas Corpus by Brian Cressler.(Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Cressler v. On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Represented By: Julie Anne Hokans
Represented By: Susan S Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Cressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?