Andre L. Revis v. Stuart Sherman et al
Plaintiff: Andre L. Revis
Defendant: T. Jones, S. Kane, K. J. Allen, Warden Stuart Sherman and J. Ortiz
Case Number: 2:2019cv06626
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Plaintiff shall pay the full filing fee no later than thirty (30) days from the date this Order is filed. (See document for details.) re #5 (sbou)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Andre L. Revis. (ch)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez Denying #2 Notice of Filing Complaint Without Prepayment of Filing Fees or REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis: IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Reason: Inadequate showing of indigency. Failure to authorize disbursement from prison trust account to pay the filing fees. Failure to provide certified copy of trust fund statement for the last six (6) months. Other: Plaintiff maybe a 3-strike litigant. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees is: DENIED, with leave to amend within 30 days. (bm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2019: #1 blank IFP form) (ch).
August 1, 2019 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Re NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) #2 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(ch)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (lh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) (lh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants K. J. Allen, T. Jones, S. Kane, J. Ortiz, Stuart Sherman pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Filed by Plaintiff Andre L. Revis. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andre L. Revis v. Stuart Sherman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. J. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Stuart Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre L. Revis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?