Sam Kim v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: SAM KIM
Defendant: SCOTT A GOODMAN TRUST, DOES 1 to 10,, STARBUCKS CORPORATION, Does 1 to 10 and Starbucks Corporation doing business as Starbucks Coffee No. 6782
Case Number: 2:2019cv06639
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has reviewed the Response filed by plaintiff and plaintiff's counsel to the Court's Order to Show Cause. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's Unruh Act and any other construction-related accessibility claim. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (See document for details) (cbr)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Sam Kimto Order to Show Cause #10 re Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration Plaintiff, #2 Declaration Plaintiff's Counsel)(Kim, Jason)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than August 21, 2019. (rrey)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kss)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Scott A Goodman Trust, Starbucks Corporation. (lh)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SAM KIM, (Kim, Jason)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SAM KIM. (Kim, Jason)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff SAM KIM. (Kim, Jason)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24180553 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff SAM KIM. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party SAM KIM(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sam Kim v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAM KIM
Represented By: Jason J Kim
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT A GOODMAN TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STARBUCKS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation doing business as Starbucks Coffee No. 6782
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?