Joseph J. Byron III v. California Department of Tax and Fee Administration
Plaintiff: Joseph J Byron and Joseph J. Byron III
Defendant: California Department of Tax and Fee Administration, DOES 1-50 and Nicolas Maduros
Case Number: 2:2019cv06742
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #6 as to Defendant Nicolas Maduros. (sbou)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #6 filed by Plaintiff Joseph J. Byron III. (Nick, J)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff Joseph J. Byron III(Nick, J)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant California Department of Tax and Fee Administration. (jtil)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (jtil)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Joseph J Byron. (Nick, J)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joseph J Byron. (Nick, J)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24197812 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Joseph J Byron. (Attorney J David Nick added to party Joseph J Byron(pty:pla))(Nick, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph J. Byron III v. California Department of Tax and Fee Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Tax and Fee Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolas Maduros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph J Byron
Represented By: J David Nick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph J. Byron III
Represented By: J David Nick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?