Hollywood Home Health Services, Inc. v. Qlarant Quality Solutions, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Hollywood Home Health Services, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive, Qlarant Quality Solutions, Inc., Qlarant Inc. and Alex M. Azar
Case Number: 2:2019cv06817
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Hollywood Home Health Services, Inc., re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #15 served on 09/18/2019. (Kohan, K)
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/1/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Qlarant Inc., Qlarant Quality Solutions, Inc., identifying Qlarant, Inc., Defendant and parent company of Qlarant Integrity Solutions, LLC and Qlarant Quality Solution, Inc.; Defendant Qlarant Quality Solutions, Inc.; Qlarant Integrity Solutions, LLC, South Western Jurisdiction Unified Program Integrity Contractor; Defendnt Alex M. Azar, United States Secretary of Health and Human Services; Department of Health and Human Services, including the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services; and Plaintiff Hollywood Home Health Services, Inc.. (Alberts, Ronald)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Qlarant Inc., Qlarant Quality Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Ronald K Alberts added to party Qlarant Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ronald K Alberts added to party Qlarant Quality Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Alberts, Ronald)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Qlarant Inc. answer now due 9/13/2019; Qlarant Quality Solutions, Inc. answer now due 9/13/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Qlarant Inc.; Qlarant Quality Solutions, Inc..(Ernster, Shannon)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Qlarant Inc. answer now due 9/6/2019; Qlarant Quality Solutions, Inc. answer now due 9/6/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Qlarant Inc.; Qlarant Quality Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Shannon Lissa Ernster added to party Qlarant Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon Lissa Ernster added to party Qlarant Quality Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ernster, Shannon)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hollywood Home Health Services, Inc., upon Defendant Qlarant Inc. served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Demonte (CT Corporation)-Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kohan, K)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hollywood Home Health Services, Inc., upon Defendant Qlarant Quality Solutions, Inc. served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Demonte (CT Corporation)-Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kohan, K)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 21/60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Alex M. Azar, Qlarant Inc., Qlarant Quality Solutions, Inc. (esa)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Platiniff HOLLYWOOD HOME HEALTH SERVICES, INC., (Kohan, K)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff HOLLYWOOD HOME HEALTH SERVICES, INC.. (Kohan, K)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff HOLLYWOOD HOME HEALTH SERVICES, INC.. (Kohan, K)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24214472 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff HOLLYWOOD HOME HEALTH SERVICES, INC.. (Attorney K Tom Kohan added to party HOLLYWOOD HOME HEALTH SERVICES, INC.(pty:pla))(Kohan, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollywood Home Health Services, Inc. v. Qlarant Quality Solutions, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qlarant Quality Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald K Alberts
Represented By: Shannon Lissa Ernster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qlarant Inc.
Represented By: Ronald K Alberts
Represented By: Shannon Lissa Ernster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollywood Home Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: K Tom Kohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?