Thomas Payne et al v. ZF Friedrichshafen AG et al

Plaintiff: NOE RIVERON, JUAN ZAMORA, KRYSTINA BONILLA, Alejandro Ramirez, ALEXIA BOUCLIER, GRISSELL DENIZARD, ARMANDO PAZ, JR., Brian Chaiken, EDUARDO CONSUEGRA, Alexander Perez, Andrea Acosta, SAMUEL CHOC, THOMAS PAYNE, Jose Portillo, DANNY BUSTAMANTE, BERNADETTE POLANSKY, Michael Hines, RYAN CRESPO, YONI BREVE and Marlene Martinez
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co Inc, TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC, Toyota Motor Corp, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Honda Motor Co Ltd, KIA MOTORS CORP, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Group, Hyundai Motor Co, ZF Friedrichshafen AG, ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORPO., Honda R&D Co. Ltd., Honda of America Mfg Inc, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc, Hyundai Motor America, TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC and KIA Motors America
Petitioner: Gilberto Perez
Case Number: 2:2019cv06894
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (lh)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Florida Southern
August 9, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per DE #6 Transfer Order. Closing Case. (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/12/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSFER ORDER (TO-Dated 8/7/2019) transferring case to the Central District of California re: MDL 2905 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt. (Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair). (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/12/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (lh)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Copy of Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 8/07/2019 regarding transfer of Case No. 1:19-cv-21681-MGC from U.S. District Court Southern District of Florida (Miami). Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:19-ml-02905-JAK (FFMx). (lh)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Courtesy Copy of TRANSFER ORDER (TO-Dated 8/7/2019) transferring case to the Central District of California re: MDL 2905 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt. (Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair). (Awaiting certified copy from the transferee court). (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/12/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Courtesy Copy of Motion of Plaintiffs Mark D. Altier, William Baerresen, Eric Fishon, Dragan Jagnjic, Cynthia Sacchett, Jacqueline Santos-Silva, Amanda Swanson, Gary E. Samouris and Nida Edith Samson for Centralization of Related Actions in the Central District of California, or in the Alternative, the Eastern District of Michigan, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 re MDL-2905. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Corrected Proof of Service)(mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/12/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 7/1/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/1/2019. (kou) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/12/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/12/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD., HONDA OF AMERICA MFG., INC., HONDA R&D CO., LTD., HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA, HYUNDAI MOTOR CO., HYUNDAI MOTOR GROUP, KIA MOTORS AMERICA, KIA MOTORS CORP., TOYOTA MOTOR CORP., TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC., TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC., TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC, TRW AUTOMOTIVE, INC., TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC., ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG, ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORPO.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11602707, filed by DANNY BUSTAMANTE, SAMUEL CHOC, NOE RIVERON, ANDREA ACOSTA, THOMAS PAYNE, JUAN ZAMORA, ALEJANDRO RAMIREZ, BERNADETTE POLANSKY, ALEXANDER PEREZ, GRISSELL DENIZARD, MARLENE MARTINEZ, GILBERTO PEREZ, BRIAN CHAIKEN, KRYSTINA BONILLA, RYAN CRESPO, ARMANDO PAZ, JR., JOSE PORTILLO, EDUARDO CONSUEGRA, ALEXIA BOUCLIER, MICHAEL HINES, YONI BREVE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Prieto, Peter) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas Payne et al v. ZF Friedrichshafen AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Motor Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIA MOTORS CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF Friedrichshafen AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORPO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda R&D Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda of America Mfg Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIA Motors America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOE RIVERON
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN ZAMORA
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRYSTINA BONILLA
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Ramirez
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXIA BOUCLIER
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRISSELL DENIZARD
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARMANDO PAZ, JR.
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Chaiken
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDUARDO CONSUEGRA
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Perez
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Acosta
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL CHOC
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS PAYNE
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Portillo
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANNY BUSTAMANTE
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERNADETTE POLANSKY
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hines
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN CRESPO
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YONI BREVE
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Martinez
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gilberto Perez
Represented By: Matthew Weinshall
Represented By: Alissa Del Riego
Represented By: John Gravante, III
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?