Regina Heilman-Ryan et al v. ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Regina Heilman-Ryan, Desiree Meyer and Steve Keister
Defendant: ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp and FCA U.S., LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv06899
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 28 Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (lh)
August 12, 2019 Filing 25 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Michigan Eastern
August 9, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Transfer to the Central District of California for MDL 2905. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 23 MDL Certified Transfer Order to Central District of California for MDL # 2905. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (lh)
August 8, 2019 Filing 26 Copy of Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 8/07/2019 regarding transfer of Case No. 4:19-cv-11464-MFL-EAS from U.S. District Court Eastern Distric of Michigan (Flint). Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:19-ml-02905-JAK (FFMx). (lh)
August 8, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Wilcox on behalf of ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Wilcox, Jason) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T. Regan on behalf of ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Regan, Matthew) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Glick on behalf of ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Glick, Michael) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Judson Brown on behalf of ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Brown, Judson) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 22 MDL Certified Transfer Order for MDL # 2905. [Informational Copy] (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. FCA US LLC served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (McDevitt, Ryan) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' #1 Class Action Complaint. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant FCA US LLC to Respond to #1 Complaint. Response due by 7/25/2019. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas L. Azar, Jr appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Azar, Thomas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kathy A. Wisniewski appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Wisniewski, Kathy) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen A. D'Aunoy appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (D'Aunoy, Stephen) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Defendant ZF TRW Holdings Corp.'s Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' #1 Class Action Complaint. Response due by 8/5/2019. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. (Letzmann, Matthew) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Letzmann on behalf of ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Letzmann, Matthew) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Herbert C. Donovan on behalf of ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Donovan, Herbert) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (McDevitt, Ryan) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ryan Patrick McDevitt appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McDevitt, Ryan) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tana Lin appearing on behalf of Regina Heilman-Ryan, Steve Keister, Desiree Meyer (Lin, Tana) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gretchen Freeman Cappio appearing on behalf of Regina Heilman-Ryan, Steve Keister, Desiree Meyer (Cappio, Gretchen) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 20, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.* (DWor) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *FCA US LLC* (DWor) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION filed by Regina Heilman-Ryan, Desiree Meyer, Steve Keister against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7244817 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Clark County, Nevada - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County, Michigan. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Sarko, Lynn) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regina Heilman-Ryan et al v. ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Heilman-Ryan
Represented By: Lynn L Sarko
Represented By: Ryan P McDevitt
Represented By: Gretchen F Cappio
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Meyer
Represented By: Lynn L Sarko
Represented By: Ryan P McDevitt
Represented By: Gretchen F Cappio
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Keister
Represented By: Lynn L Sarko
Represented By: Ryan P McDevitt
Represented By: Gretchen F Cappio
Represented By: Tana Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp
Represented By: Jason Wilcox
Represented By: Matthew Letzmann
Represented By: Matthew T Regan
Represented By: Michael A Glick
Represented By: Herbert C Donovan
Represented By: Judson D Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA U.S., LLC
Represented By: Thomas L Azar
Represented By: Stephen A D'Aunoy
Represented By: Kathy A Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?