Dianne Walton et al v. Kopelowitz Ostrow, P.A. et al
Plaintiff: Larry Shaw, Concepcion Abad-Santos, Thomas Tcimpidis, Nancy Burcham, Roger Kapit, Dianne Walton, Mark Alastair Prescott, Richard Di Cesare, Stephen Polk, Rene Abad-Santos, George Raquelsantos, Richard Stanis, Inagene Bonanno, Richard Urrico, Eloisa Valencia, Don Stewart, Jennifer Polk, Richard Parent, Alexander Juliano, Cammy Leyton, Reita Stanis, Annalise Parent and Don Stewart, Jr.
Defendant: Andrew Dale Ledbetter, Kopelowitz Ostrow and Kopelowitz Ostrow, P.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv06919
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 28 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) filed by plaintiff Concepcion Abad-Santos, Rene Abad-Santos, Inagene Bonanno, Nancy Burcham, Richard Di Cesare, Alexander Juliano, Roger Kapit, Cammy Leyton, Annalise Parent, Richard Parent, Jennifer Polk, Stephen Polk, Mark Alastair Prescott, George Raquelsantos, Larry Shaw, Reita Stanis, Richard Stanis, Don Stewart, Jr, Thomas Tcimpidis, Richard Urrico, Eloisa Valencia, Dianne Walton.(Siegel, Elliot)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney Alexander N. Loftus APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs, designating Elliot Siegel as local counsel. (mrgo)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #24 Non-Resident Attorney Joseph Wojciechowski APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs, designating Elliot Siegel as local counsel. (mrgo)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (tj)
August 16, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph Wojciechowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Concepcion Abad-Santos, Rene Abad-Santos, Inagene Bonanno, Nancy Burcham, Richard Di Cesare, Alexander Juliano, Roger Kapit, Cammy Leyton, Annalise Parent, Richard Parent, Jennifer Polk, Stephen Polk, Mark Alastair Prescott, George Raquelsantos, Larry Shaw, Reita Stanis, Richard Stanis, Don Stewart, Jr, Thomas Tcimpidis, Richard Urrico, Eloisa Valencia, Dianne Walton (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24276138) filed by plaintiff Concepcion Abad-Santos, Rene Abad-Santos, Inagene Bonanno, Nancy Burcham, Richard Di Cesare, Alexander Juliano, Roger Kapit, Cammy Leyton, Annalise Parent, Richard Parent, Jennifer Polk, Stephen Polk, Mark Alastair Prescott, George Raquelsantos, Larry Shaw, Reita Stanis, Richard Stanis, Don Stewart, Jr, Thomas Tcimpidis, Richard Urrico, Eloisa Valencia, Dianne Walton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 proposed order) (Siegel, Elliot)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-06919 SVW(ASx). (rn)
August 14, 2019 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Andrew Dale Ledbetter. (lom)
August 14, 2019 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Kopelowitz Ostrow, P.A. (lom)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander N. Loftus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Concepcion Abad-Santos, Rene Abad-Santos, Inagene Bonanno, Nancy Burcham, Richard Di Cesare, Alexander Juliano, Roger Kapit, Cammy Leyton, Annalise Parent, Richard Parent, Jennifer Polk, Stephen Polk, Mark Alastair Prescott, George Raquelsantos, Larry Shaw, Reita Stanis, Richard Stanis, Don Stewart, Jr, Thomas Tcimpidis, Richard Urrico, Eloisa Valencia, Dianne Walton (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 8/9/2019, Receipt No. 26JDDUB4) filed by Plaintiffs Concepcion Abad-Santos, Rene Abad-Santos, Inagene Bonanno, Nancy Burcham, Richard Di Cesare, Alexander Juliano, Roger Kapit, Cammy Leyton, Annalise Parent, Richard Parent, Jennifer Polk, Stephen Polk, Mark Alastair Prescott, George Raquelsantos, Larry Shaw, Reita Stanis, Richard Stanis, Don Stewart, Jr, Thomas Tcimpidis, Richard Urrico, Eloisa Valencia, Dianne Walton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Siegel, Elliot)
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request, #16 filed by plaintiff Concepcion Abad-Santos, Rene Abad-Santos, Inagene Bonanno, Nancy Burcham, Richard Di Cesare, Alexander Juliano, Roger Kapit, Cammy Leyton, Annalise Parent, Richard Parent, Jennifer Polk, Stephen Polk, Mark Alastair Prescott, George Raquelsantos, Larry Shaw, Reita Stanis, Richard Stanis, Don Stewart, Jr, Thomas Tcimpidis, Richard Urrico, Eloisa Valencia, Dianne Walton. (Siegel, Elliot)
August 13, 2019 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request, #15 filed by plaintiff Concepcion Abad-Santos, Rene Abad-Santos, Inagene Bonanno, Nancy Burcham, Richard Di Cesare, Alexander Juliano, Roger Kapit, Cammy Leyton, Annalise Parent, Richard Parent, Jennifer Polk, Stephen Polk, Mark Alastair Prescott, George Raquelsantos, Larry Shaw, Reita Stanis, Richard Stanis, Don Stewart, Jr, Thomas Tcimpidis, Richard Urrico, Eloisa Valencia, Dianne Walton. (Siegel, Elliot)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander N. Loftus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Concepcion Abad-Santos, Rene Abad-Santos, Inagene Bonanno, Nancy Burcham, Richard Di Cesare, Alexander Juliano, Roger Kapit, Cammy Leyton, Annalise #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Application and proposed order are inconsistent. Application lists 5 parties and the proposed order lists 22 parties. (lt)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,, #1 filed by plaintiff Concepcion Abad-Santos, Rene Abad-Santos, Inagene Bonanno, Nancy Burcham, Richard Di Cesare, Alexander Juliano, Roger Kapit, Cammy Leyton, Annalise Parent, Richard Parent, Jennifer Polk, Stephen Polk, Mark Alastair Prescott, George Raquelsantos, Larry Shaw, Reita Stanis, Richard Stanis, Don Stewart, Jr, Thomas Tcimpidis, Richard Urrico, Eloisa Valencia, Dianne Walton. (Siegel, Elliot)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,, #1 filed by plaintiff Concepcion Abad-Santos, Rene Abad-Santos, Inagene Bonanno, Nancy Burcham, Richard Di Cesare, Alexander Juliano, Roger Kapit, Cammy Leyton, Annalise Parent, Richard Parent, Jennifer Polk, Stephen Polk, Mark Alastair Prescott, George Raquelsantos, Larry Shaw, Reita Stanis, Richard Stanis, Don Stewart, Jr, Thomas Tcimpidis, Richard Urrico, Eloisa Valencia, Dianne Walton. (Siegel, Elliot)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #13 , Summons Request, #12 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,, #1 filed by plaintiff Concepcion Abad-Santos, Rene Abad-Santos, Inagene Bonanno, Nancy Burcham, Richard Di Cesare, Alexander Juliano, Roger Kapit, Cammy Leyton, Annalise Parent, Richard Parent, Jennifer Polk, Stephen Polk, Mark Alastair Prescott, George Raquelsantos, Larry Shaw, Reita Stanis, Richard Stanis, Don Stewart, Jr, Thomas Tcimpidis, Richard Urrico, Eloisa Valencia, Dianne Walton. (Siegel, Elliot)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,, #1 filed by plaintiff Concepcion Abad-Santos, Rene Abad-Santos, Inagene Bonanno, Nancy Burcham, Richard Di Cesare, Alexander Juliano, Roger Kapit, Cammy Leyton, Annalise Parent, Richard Parent, Jennifer Polk, Stephen Polk, Mark Alastair Prescott, George Raquelsantos, Larry Shaw, Reita Stanis, Richard Stanis, Don Stewart, Jr, Thomas Tcimpidis, Richard Urrico, Eloisa Valencia, Dianne Walton. (Siegel, Elliot)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #9 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Case no. is incomplete; no Judge's initials. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander N. Loftus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Concepcion Abad-Santos, Rene Abad-Santos, Inagene Bonanno, Nancy Burcham, Richard Di Cesare, Alexander Juliano, Roger Kapit, Cammy Leyton, Annalise Parent, Richard Parent, Jennifer Polk, Stephen Polk, Mark Alastair Prescott, George Raquelsantos, Larry Shaw, Reita Stanis, Richard Stanis, Don Stewart, Jr, Thomas Tcimpidis, Richard Urrico, Eloisa Valencia, Dianne Walton (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24238707) filed by plaintiff Concepcion Abad-Santos, Rene Abad-Santos, Inagene Bonanno, Nancy Burcham, Richard Di Cesare, Alexander Juliano, Roger Kapit, Cammy Leyton, Annalise Parent, Richard Parent, Jennifer Polk, Stephen Polk, Mark Alastair Prescott, George Raquelsantos, Larry Shaw, Reita Stanis, Richard Stanis, Don Stewart, Jr, Thomas Tcimpidis, Richard Urrico, Eloisa Valencia, Dianne Walton. (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Siegel, Elliot)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,, #1 filed by plaintiff Concepcion Abad-Santos, Rene Abad-Santos, Inagene Bonanno, Nancy Burcham, Richard Di Cesare, Alexander Juliano, Roger Kapit, Cammy Leyton, Annalise Parent, Richard Parent, Jennifer Polk, Stephen Polk, Mark Alastair Prescott, George Raquelsantos, Larry Shaw, Reita Stanis, Richard Stanis, Don Stewart, Jr, Thomas Tcimpidis, Richard Urrico, Eloisa Valencia, Dianne Walton. (Siegel, Elliot)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph Wojciechowski. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Alexander N. Loftus. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 plaintiffs' NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Siegel, Elliot)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Concepcion Abad-Santos, Rene Abad-Santos, Inagene Bonanno, Nancy Burcham, Richard Di Cesare, Alexander Juliano, Roger Kapit, Cammy Leyton, Annalise Parent, Richard Parent, Jennifer Polk, Stephen Polk, Mark Alastair Prescott, George Raquelsantos, Larry Shaw, Reita Stanis, Richard Stanis, Don Stewart, Thomas Tcimpidis, Richard Urrico, Eloisa Valencia, Dianne Walton. (Siegel, Elliot)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,, #1 filed by plaintiff Concepcion Abad-Santos, Rene Abad-Santos, Inagene Bonanno, Nancy Burcham, Richard Di Cesare, Alexander Juliano, Roger Kapit, Cammy Leyton, Annalise Parent, Richard Parent, Jennifer Polk, Stephen Polk, Mark Alastair Prescott, George Raquelsantos, Larry Shaw, Reita Stanis, Richard Stanis, Don Stewart, Thomas Tcimpidis, Richard Urrico, Eloisa Valencia, Dianne Walton. (Siegel, Elliot)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24231523 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Concepcion Abad-Santos, Mark Alastair Prescott, George Raquelsantos, Richard Urrico, Richard Stanis, Cammy Leyton, Dianne Walton, Nancy Burcham, Jennifer Polk, Inagene Bonanno, Thomas Tcimpidis, Reita Stanis, Alexander Juliano, Don Stewart, Richard Di Cesare, Annalise Parent, Stephen Polk, Eloisa Valencia, Roger Kapit, Rene Abad-Santos, Richard Parent, Larry Shaw. (Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Concepcion Abad-Santos(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Rene Abad-Santos(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Inagene Bonanno(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Nancy Burcham(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Richard Di Cesare(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Alexander Juliano(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Roger Kapit(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Cammy Leyton(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Annalise Parent(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Richard Parent(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Jennifer Polk(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Stephen Polk(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Mark Alastair Prescott(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party George Raquelsantos(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Larry Shaw(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Reita Stanis(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Richard Stanis(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Don Stewart (pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Thomas Tcimpidis(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Richard Urrico(pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Eloisa Valencia (pty:pla), Attorney Elliot Siegel added to party Dianne Walton(pty:pla))(Siegel, Elliot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dianne Walton et al v. Kopelowitz Ostrow, P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Shaw
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concepcion Abad-Santos
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Tcimpidis
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Burcham
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Kapit
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Walton
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Alastair Prescott
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Di Cesare
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Polk
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Abad-Santos
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Raquelsantos
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Stanis
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inagene Bonanno
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Urrico
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eloisa Valencia
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Stewart
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Polk
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Parent
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Juliano
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cammy Leyton
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reita Stanis
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annalise Parent
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Stewart, Jr.
Represented By: Alexander N Loftus
Represented By: Joseph R Wojciechowski
Represented By: Elliot Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Dale Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kopelowitz Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kopelowitz Ostrow, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?