Humana, Inc. v. Mallinckrodt ARD LLC et al
Plaintiff: Humana, Inc.
Defendant: Mallinckrodt ARD LLC and Mallinckrodt PLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv06926
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 46 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Mallinckrodt ARD LLC Humana, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Humana, Inc.(Solberg, Scott)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Leave to File Amended Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule #44 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
September 30, 2019 Filing 44 STIPULATION to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Mallinckrodt ARD LLC and Plaintiff Humana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Redline of Complaint to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Humana Proposed Amendments Chart, #4 Proposed Order)(Solberg, Scott)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #40 Non-Resident Attorney Matthew M Wolf APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Mallinckrodt ARD LLC, designating David Eric Shapland as local counsel. (jp)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #39 Non-Resident Attorney Laura S Shores APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Mallinckrodt ARD LLC, designating David Eric Shapland as local counsel. (jp)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #38 Non-Resident Attorney Michael B Bernstein APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Mallinckrodt ARD LLC, designating David Eric Shapland as local counsel. (jp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 40 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew M. Wolf to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Mallinckrodt ARD LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24499010) filed by defendant Mallinckrodt ARD LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from DC Bar, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from Maryland Court of Appeals, #3 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Shapland, David)
September 25, 2019 Filing 39 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Laura Scott Shores to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Mallinckrodt ARD LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24498877) filed by defendant Mallinckrodt ARD LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from DC Bar, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from Alabama Supreme Court, #3 Proposed Order) (Shapland, David)
September 25, 2019 Filing 38 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael B. Bernstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Mallinckrodt ARD LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24498547) filed by defendant Mallinckrodt ARD LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from DC, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from Illinois, #3 Proposed Order) (Shapland, David)
September 25, 2019 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sonia Kuester Pfaffenroth counsel for Defendant Mallinckrodt ARD LLC. Adding Sonia Kuester Pfaffenroth as counsel of record for Mallinckrodt ARD LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Mallinckrodt ARD LLC. (Attorney Sonia Kuester Pfaffenroth added to party Mallinckrodt ARD LLC(pty:dft))(Pfaffenroth, Sonia)
September 25, 2019 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Adam M Pergament counsel for Defendant Mallinckrodt ARD LLC. Adding Adam M. Pergment as counsel of record for Mallinckrodt ARD LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Mallinckrodt ARD LLC. (Attorney Adam M Pergament added to party Mallinckrodt ARD LLC(pty:dft))(Pergament, Adam)
September 25, 2019 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Eric Shapland counsel for Defendant Mallinckrodt ARD LLC. Adding D. Eric Shapland as counsel of record for Mallinckrodt ARD LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Mallinckrodt ARD LLC. (Attorney David Eric Shapland added to party Mallinckrodt ARD LLC(pty:dft))(Shapland, David)
September 23, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE Of Dismissal of Mallinckrodt PLC, without prejudice Humana, Inc.. (Solberg, Scott)
September 5, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Humana, Inc.to Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form,,, #26 NOTICE OF FILING WISCONSIN CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING FOR SCOTT CHARLES SOLBERG (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Matz, Jeremy)
August 29, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Humana, Inc.to Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form,,, #26 NOTICE OF FILING OF CERTIFICATES OF GOOD STANDING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- James W. Joseph Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B- Scott C. Solberg Certificate of Good Standing)(Matz, Jeremy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Scott C. Solberg Affidavit of Service to Attorney General Mark Brnovich filed by Plaintiff Humana, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Delivery Receipt)(Solberg, Scott)
August 23, 2019 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Humana, Inc.. upon Mallinckrodt ARD LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; Mallinckrodt PLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Waiver of Service signed by G. Patrick Watson. (Matz, Jeremy)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #16 , #24 Non-Resident Attorney Scott C Solberg APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Humana, Inc., designating Gary S Lincenberg as local counsel. (jp)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #15 , #23 Non-Resident Attorney James W Joseph APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Humana, Inc., designating Gary S Lincenberg as local counsel. (jp)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #14 , #22 Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin E Waldin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Humana, Inc., designating Gary S Lincenberg as local counsel. (jp)
August 21, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James W. Joseph to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Humana, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 8/13/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24247335) #23 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Scott C. Solberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Humana, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 8/13/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24247416) #24 by Clerk of Court to Judge Dale S. Fischer: (1) The document is accepted as filed. (2) Dockets #15 , #16 and #23 and #24 are Accepted. Counsel are to file the Certificate of Good Standing for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted no later than 9/9/2019. Failure to file the Certificates will result in the striking of the applications. (jp)
August 19, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James W. Joseph to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Humana, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 8/13/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24247335) #23 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Scott C. Solberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Humana, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 8/13/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24247416) #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt)
August 16, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Scott C. Solberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Humana, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 8/13/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24247416) filed by Plaintiff Humana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Advisement) (Matz, Jeremy)
August 16, 2019 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James W. Joseph to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Humana, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 8/13/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24247335) filed by Plaintiff Humana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Advisement) (Matz, Jeremy)
August 16, 2019 Filing 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin E. Waldin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Humana, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 8/13/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24247216) filed by Plaintiff Humana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Matz, Jeremy)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (pg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Scott C. Solberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Humana, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24247416) #16 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James W. Joseph to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Humana, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24247335) #15 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin E. Waldin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Humana, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24247216) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-06926 DSF(MRWx). (rn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Mallinckrodt PLC. (lom)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Mallinckrodt ARD LLC. (lom)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Scott C. Solberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Humana, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24247416) filed by Plaintiff Humana, Inc.. (Matz, Jeremy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James W. Joseph to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Humana, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24247335) filed by Plaintiff Humana, Inc.. (Matz, Jeremy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin E. Waldin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Humana, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24247216) filed by Plaintiff Humana, Inc.. (Matz, Jeremy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #5 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #8 filed by Plaintiff Humana, Inc.. (Matz, Jeremy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #8 , Summons Request #4 filed by Plaintiff Humana, Inc.. (Matz, Jeremy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Scott C Solberg. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James W Joseph. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin E Waldin. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 , Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car) Modified on 8/9/2019 (car).
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Humana, Inc.. (Matz, Jeremy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Humana, Inc.. (Matz, Jeremy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Humana, Inc. (Matz, Jeremy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Humana, Inc.. (Matz, Jeremy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24232517 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Humana, Inc.. (Attorney Jeremy D Matz added to party Humana, Inc.(pty:pla))(Matz, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humana, Inc. v. Mallinckrodt ARD LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humana, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy D Matz
Represented By: Benjamin E Waldin
Represented By: Gary S Lincenberg
Represented By: Scott C Solberg
Represented By: James W Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt ARD LLC
Represented By: Matthew M Wolf
Represented By: Sonia Kuester Pfaffenroth
Represented By: Adam M Pergament
Represented By: Michael B Bernstein
Represented By: Laura S Shores
Represented By: David Eric Shapland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?