James Chen v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: James Chen
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.,, Synchrony Bank N.A., Gemini Trust Company, LLC, Bank of America, N.A. and DOES 1 100 Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv06941
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Fifth Cause of Action #18 filed by Defendant Gemini Trust Company, LLC. (Ferguson, Samuel)
October 1, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. See Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Electronic Lodging of Proposed Orders. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
September 30, 2019 Filing 22 Opposition in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Fifth Cause of Action #18 filed by Plaintiff James Chen. (Khojayan, Vahe)
September 30, 2019 Filing 21 Opposition in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case as to Bank of America, N.A. #19 filed by Plaintiff James Chen. (Khojayan, Vahe)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING JOINT STIPULATION AND APPLICATION TO EXTEND #16 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (iv)
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case as to Bank of America, N.A. filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 10/21/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Kenneth)
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Fifth Cause of Action filed by Defendant Gemini Trust Company, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/21/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Ferguson, Samuel)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION AS TO DEFENDANT SYNCHRONY BANK, N.A. PENDING ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS #15 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This case in the United States District Court for the Central District of California is stayed as to Synchrony only pending resolution of the arbitration. (iv)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 Joint APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 9/16/2019 filed by Defendant Gemini Trust Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit A Proposed Order) (Meade, Tyler)
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Completion of Arbitration filed by Defendant Synchrony Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Atteberry, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-06941 MWF(SKx). (rn)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-06941 MWF(MAAx). (rn)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Synchrony Bank N.A. answer now due 9/9/2019; Bank of America, N.A. answer now due 9/9/2019; Gemini Trust Company, LLC answer now due 9/9/2019, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Synchrony Bank N.A..(Atteberry, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey A Atteberry counsel for Defendant Synchrony Bank N.A.. Adding Jeffrey A. Atteberry as counsel of record for Synchrony Bank N.A. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Synchrony Bank N.A.. (Attorney Jeffrey A Atteberry added to party Synchrony Bank N.A.(pty:dft))(Atteberry, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner to the calendar of Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-06941 MWF(KSx). (rn)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #8 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tyler R Meade counsel for Defendant Gemini Trust Company, LLC. Adding Tyler Meade as counsel of record for Gemini Trust Company, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Gemini Trust Company, LLC. (Attorney Tyler R Meade added to party Gemini Trust Company, LLC(pty:dft))(Meade, Tyler)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Samuel Ivan Ferguson counsel for Defendant Gemini Trust Company, LLC. Adding Sam Ferguson as counsel of record for Gemini Trust Company, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Gemini Trust Company, LLC. (Attorney Samuel Ivan Ferguson added to party Gemini Trust Company, LLC(pty:dft))(Ferguson, Samuel)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
August 9, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff James Chen in Los Angeles Superior Court on 7/1/2019, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Seena Forouzan on behalf of Defendant Gemini Trust Company, LLC (Attorney Seena Forouzan added to party Gemini Trust Company, LLC(pty:dft))(Forouzan, Seena)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.,, identifying Bank of America Corporation, BANA Holding, BAC North America Holding Company, NB Holdings Corporation. (Miller, Kenneth)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.,. (Miller, Kenneth)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County, case number 19STCV23170 Receipt No: 0973-24235508 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Complaint) (Attorney Kenneth Sur Miller added to party BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.,(pty:dft))(Miller, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Chen v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Chen
Represented By: Vahe V Khojayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.,
Represented By: Kenneth Sur Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank N.A.
Represented By: Jeffrey A Atteberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemini Trust Company, LLC
Represented By: Seena Forouzan
Represented By: Anne Decker
Represented By: Samuel Ivan Ferguson
Represented By: Tyler R Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Kenneth Sur Miller
Represented By: Austin Benjamin Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?