Sherrie Louise Myles v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Sherrie Louise Myles
Defendant: Commissioner of Soci Andrew Saul and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv06945
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul H Sachelari counsel for Defendant Andrew Saul. Paul Sachelari is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Sachelari, Paul)
October 5, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tina Naicker counsel for Defendant Andrew Saul. Adding Tina Naicker as counsel of record for Commissioner of Social Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Tina Naicker added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Naicker, Tina)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-6945 PLA on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Paul H Sachelari added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Sachelari, Paul)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Sherrie Louise Myles. (McCabe, Patricia)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sherrie Louise Myles, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Flavia De La Rosa. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on Andrew Saul, Commissioner Social Security, #2 Proof of Service on Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX, Social Security Administration, #3 Proof of Service on U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Dept. of Justice)(McCabe, Patricia)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ch)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Andrew Saul. (ch)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby GRANTED. #2 (ch)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Sherrie Louise Myles. (McCabe, Patricia)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sherrie Louise Myles, identifying Social Security Administration. (McCabe, Patricia)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sherrie Louise Myles. (McCabe, Patricia)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Sherrie Louise Myles. (McCabe, Patricia)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Sherrie Louise Myles. (Attorney Patricia L McCabe added to party Sherrie Louise Myles(pty:pla))(McCabe, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherrie Louise Myles v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrie Louise Myles
Represented By: Patricia L McCabe
Represented By: Kristin Elizabeth Berk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Soci Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Paul H Sachelari
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?