Caravan Canopy Intl, Inc. v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Caravan Canopy Intl, Inc.
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv06978
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
2 Judge: Alka Sagar
3 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT, #16 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Defendant shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before November 1, 2019. (es)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 1, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Megan Chung added to party Walmart, Inc.(pty:dft))(Chung, Megan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Association of Counsel, #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney J. Curtis Edmondson on behalf of Plaintiff Caravan Canopy Intl, Inc.. Filed by Plaintiff Caravan Canopy Intl, Inc. (Attorney Joseph Curtis Edmondson added to party Caravan Canopy Intl, Inc.(pty:pla))(Edmondson, Joseph)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #12 Plaintiff CARAVAN CANOPY INT'L, INC. Request to Substitute Attorney Kumar Maheshwari as attorney of record in place an stead of Attorney Robert J. Lauson, Esq. and Judd M. Patton, Esq. (es)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 First REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Kumar Maheshwari in place of attorney Robert J. Lauson /s/ Kumar Maheshwari filed by plaintiff Caravan Canopy Intl, Inc.. (Attorney Kumar Maheshwari, Mahes added to party Caravan Canopy Intl, Inc.(pty:pla)) (Maheshwari, Kumar)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Caravan Canopy Intl, Inc. answer now due 10/4/2019, filed by Plaintiff Caravan Canopy Intl, Inc..(Lauson, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-01072 AG(ADSx). Case transferred from Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-06978 AG(ADSx). Signed by Judge Andrew J. Guilford (rn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Walmart, Inc.. (esa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Caravan Canopy Intl, Inc.. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-01702-AG-ADS; 5:19-cv-01224-AG-ADS; 2:19-cv-06031-AG-ADS; 2:19-cv-06224-AG-ADS; 2:19-cv-06952 (Lauson, Robert)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Caravan Canopy Intl, Inc.. (Lauson, Robert)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Caravan Canopy Intl, Inc., identifying Caravan Canopy Int'l, Inc. and Walmart, Inc.. (Lauson, Robert)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Caravan Canopy Intl, Inc.. (Lauson, Robert)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Caravan Canopy Intl, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Lauson, Robert)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24243511 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Caravan Canopy Intl, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D) (Attorney Robert J Lauson added to party Caravan Canopy Intl, Inc.(pty:pla))(Lauson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caravan Canopy Intl, Inc. v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caravan Canopy Intl, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J Lauson
Represented By: Judd M Patton
Represented By: Kumar Maheshwari
Represented By: Joseph Curtis Edmondson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?